EP4167806 - SYSTEM FOR DISPENSING GROUND COFFEE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 31.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AIT, BOUZIAD, Youcef 1026 Echandens / CH | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Pasquino, Fabio Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/17] | Navarro Fernández, Maria Isabel Société des Produits Nestlé S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 21725145.3 | 11.05.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021EP62386 | Priority number, date | EP20200181371 | 22.06.2020 Original published format: EP 20181371 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021259549 | Date: | 30.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4167806 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/42, A47J42/44, A47J42/50, A47J43/07 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
A47J31/42 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A47J42/44 (EP,IL,KR);
A47J42/50 (EP,IL,KR);
A47J2043/0733 (EP,IL,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR AUSGABE VON GEMAHLENEM KAFFEE | [2023/17] | English: | SYSTEM FOR DISPENSING GROUND COFFEE | [2023/17] | French: | SYSTÈME POUR DISTRIBUER DU CAFÉ MOULU | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 23.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2012138327 (ADAGER CORP [US], et al) [Y] 18 * figure 1A; claims 1, 6, 8 *[A] 1-17,19; | [YA]US2013133520 (HULETT RANDY [US], et al) [Y] 6 * figures 8, 23, 42; claim 1 * [A] 1-5,7-19; | [XAY]EP2862487 (KONINKL DOUWE EGBERTS BV [NL]) [X] 1-3,6-9,13-16,19 * figures 1, 2B, 2D, 8a-d; claim 1 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0019] , [0 21] , [0033] , [0035] , [0060] , [0063] , [0066] , [0067] * * paragraphs [0070] , [0071] , [0075] , [0 76] , [0 98] , [ 100] * [A] 4,5,10,17,18 [Y] 8,11,12; | [YA]US9532682 (LASSOTA ZBIGNIEW G [US], et al) [Y] 11,12 * figures 1, 3, 3A/B, 4, 6A/B,; claim 1 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 53 * * column 2, line 23 - line 56 * * column 3, line 9 - line 43 * * column 8, line 59 - line 67 * * column 14, line 17 - column 16, line 10 * [A] 1-10,13-19; | [YA]US10105009 (TEAHAN MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 8 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 53 * [A] 1-7,9-19; | [XAYI]WO2019122397 (CREATRIX AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,6-9,13,16 * figures 1-3, 13-15, 16B; claim 1 * * page 1, line 8 - line 11 * * page 8, line 30 - page 9, line 1 * * page 15, line 31 - page 16, line 11 * * page 17, line 22 - line 26 * * page 18, line 29 - page 19, line 2 * * page 23, line 31 - page 24, line 16 * [A] 4,5,10,14,15,17 [Y] 8,11,12,18 [I] 19; | [XAYI]EP3574811 (GRUPPO CIMBALI SPA [IT]) [X] 1-10,13-15 * figures 1, 4-6 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0012] , [0014] , [0019] - [0026] - [0028] , [0033] - [0036] * [A] 16-18 [Y] 6,8,11,12 [I] 19 | by applicant | - Coffee Freshness handbook, Specialty Coffee Association |