EP4153577 - NEW MALONITRILE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DÉCORET, Guillaume 4070 Basel / CH | 02 /
GALLEY, Guido 4070 Basel / CH | 03 /
GROEBKE ZBINDEN, Katrin 4070 Basel / CH | 04 /
GROSSMANN, Nicole 4070 Basel / CH | 05 /
GUBA, Wolfgang 4070 Basel / CH | 06 /
HUNZIKER, Daniel 4070 Basel / CH | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Vitra, Hermeto F. Hoffman-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/13] | Salud, Carlos E. F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Patent Department Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 21725213.9 | 18.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021EP63041 | Priority number, date | EP20200175648 | 20.05.2020 Original published format: EP 20175648 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021233854 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4153577 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/32, C07D413/12, A61P29/00, A61K31/422 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
C07D263/32 (EP);
C07D261/08 (US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
C07D413/12 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | MALONITRILDERIVATE | [2023/13] | English: | NEW MALONITRILE DERIVATIVES | [2023/13] | French: | NOUVEAUX DÉRIVÉS DE MALONITRILE | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 20.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4330105 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2019055750 (ADURO BIOTECH INC [US]) [A] 1-19* paragraphs [0002] , [ 323] - [0330]; claims 1-38 * | by applicant | - G. TRINCHIERI, J Exp Med, (20100000), vol. 207, no. 10, pages 2053 - 63 |