EP4154348 - ELECTROCHEMICAL ELEMENT AND CORRESPONDING BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 21.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAFT 26 Quai Charles Pasqua 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/13] | For all designated states SAFT 26 Quai Charles Pasqua 92300 Lavallois-Perret / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLONZ, Valentin 33110 LE BOUSCAT / FR | 02 /
BEUGNON, Alexandre 33290 LE PIAN MEDOC / FR | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 21725547.0 | 18.05.2021 | [2023/13] | WO2021EP63112 | Priority number, date | FR20200005031 | 19.05.2020 Original published format: FR 2005031 | [2023/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021233898 | Date: | 25.11.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4154348 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M50/103, H01M50/105, H01M50/129, H01M50/211, H01M50/547, H01M50/557 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
H01M50/103 (EP);
H01M50/548 (US);
H01M10/647 (EP,US);
H01M50/105 (EP,US);
H01M50/119 (US);
H01M50/129 (EP);
H01M50/211 (EP);
H01M50/547 (EP);
H01M50/557 (EP);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHES ELEMENT UND ENTSPRECHENDE BATTERIE | [2023/13] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL ELEMENT AND CORRESPONDING BATTERY | [2023/13] | French: | ELÉMENT ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE ET BATTERIE CORRESPONDANTE | [2023/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 18.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]US5419982 (TURA DREW D [US], et al) [YD] 1-11 * page 8, line 13 - page 11, line 31 * * page 14, line 28 - page 18, line 4; figures 3-6, 6A *; | [Y]US2013130087 (KAWAGUCHI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 48] , [0 52]; figures 1, 2 *; | [Y]US2019237830 (KIM SUN KYU [KR], et al) [Y] 5,6* paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0 34] - [0037]; figure 2 * | by applicant | WO9120100 | EP0487699 | WO9516283 | WO03026042 | EP1428272 | WO2005039013 | EP1678804 | WO2012057854 | CN202373667U | US2013101891 | US2015364729 | KR20160041402 | WO2016205663 | EP3311443 | CN108400385 | US10490781 |