EP4143940 - A GRID CONNECTED BATTERY STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VESTAS WIND SYSTEMS A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAGHUCHANDRA, Karthikeya Balladi 8200 Aarhus N / DK | 02 /
REZKALLA, Michel Maher Naguib 8200 Aarhus N / DK | 03 /
CHRISTENSEN, Lars Christian 8800 Viborg / DK | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Vestas Patents Department Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21725696.5 | 29.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021DK50133 | Priority number, date | DK2020PA70275 | 30.04.2020 Original published format: DK PA202070275 | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021219186 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143940 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/32, H02J1/10 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
H02J3/32 (EP,US);
H02J1/102 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | GITTERVERBUNDENES BATTERIESPEICHERSYSTEM | [2023/10] | English: | A GRID CONNECTED BATTERY STORAGE SYSTEM | [2023/10] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE DE BATTERIE CONNECTÉ AU RÉSEAU | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 28.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN202564965U (SHANGHAI MUNICIPAL ELEC POWER) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2014181081 (UNIV ASTON [GB]) [Y] 1-10 * page 24, line 32 - page 25, line 18; figure 3 *; | [Y]US2015069844 (WU HONG-YANG [CN], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0034] , [0 44] - [0045]; figures 6-7 *; | [A]WO2016029128 (EAST PENN MFG CO [US]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0008]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2017237355 (STIENEKER MARCO [DE], et al) [Y] 4,10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0018] , [0031]; figures 1,3 *; | [A]US2018076637 (SHIRAKI TOORU [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0024] - [0040]; figures 1,5 *; | [Y]WO2018153459 (FRAMATOME GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, lines 5-28 * * page 10, lines 23-34 * * page 13, lines 8-14; figure 4 *; | [Y]CN111016742 (QINGHAI NEGO NEW ENERGY CO LTD) [Y] 9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0081] - [0084] * | by applicant | US9537318 |