Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP4121115
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
18.04.2025 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.04.2025 |
First examination report |
|
26.03.2025 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.03.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.08.2023 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
05.08.2023 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.08.2023 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
05.08.2023 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
08.06.2023 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.06.2023 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
24.03.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
23.12.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] |
23.12.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
23.12.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.01.2023 [2023/04] |
31.10.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2022 |
New entry: Fee payment for validation state |
|
26.10.2022 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
21.10.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.10.2022 |
Change - representative |
|
19.10.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.09.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
10.05.2022 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
24.09.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.09.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
24.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|