EP4142747 - VIRUS-SPECIFIC IMMUNE CELLS EXPRESSING CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baylor College of Medicine One Baylor Plaza Houston, TX 77030 / US | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUACH, David H. Houston, Texas 77030 / US | 02 /
ROONEY, Cliona M. Houston, Texas 77030 / US | 03 /
RAMOS, Carlos A. Houston, Texas 77030 / US | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/10] | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 21725957.1 | 27.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021US70459 | Priority number, date | US202063015769P | 27.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063015769 P | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021222927 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4142747 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/17, A61P35/00, C07K14/725, C07K16/28, C07K14/705 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
C07K14/7051 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0636 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/2878 (EP,KR,US);
A61K2239/26 (EP,US);
A61K2239/29 (EP,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,US);
A61K2239/38 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/4621 (EP,US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/46434 (EP,US);
A61K39/464412 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/464417 (EP,KR,US);
A61K39/464838 (EP,US);
A61P31/22 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/70521 (EP,KR,US);
C07K14/70578 (US);
C07K16/2803 (US);
H04B1/713 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (US);
A61K2039/5156 (US);
A61K2121/00 (KR);
A61K2300/00 (KR);
A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2317/53 (US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (US);
C07K2319/02 (KR,US);
C07K2319/03 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2319/33 (EP,KR,US);
C12N2510/00 (KR);
H04B2201/71338 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE ANTIGENREZEPTOREN EXPRIMIERENDE VIRUSSPEZIFISCHE IMMUNZELLEN | [2023/10] | English: | VIRUS-SPECIFIC IMMUNE CELLS EXPRESSING CHIMERIC ANTIGEN RECEPTORS | [2023/10] | French: | CELLULES IMMUNITAIRES SPÉCIFIQUES À UN VIRUS EXPRIMANT DES RÉCEPTEURS ANTIGÉNIQUES CHIMÉRIQUES | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 21.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 20.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 20.09.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 20.09.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2015028444 (UNIVERSITÄT ZU KÖLN [DE]); | by applicant | WO03059282 | WO2004010957 | WO2005001038 | US2005009769 | WO2006089232 | WO2007044616 | US2007166309 | WO2007084672 | US2007258987 | WO2011041093 | WO2012031744 | WO2013088114 | WO2015028444 | WO2016008973 | WO2017202478 | WO2018038945 | WO2018052947 | US2018250379 | WO2020068764 | WO2020214479 | US19690630157 |