EP4143178 - CYCLOALKYL PYRIMIDINES AS FERROPORTIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global Blood Therapeutics, Inc. 181 Oyster Point Blvd. South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Qing South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 02 /
ALT, Carsten South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 03 /
LI, Zhe South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 04 /
NILAR, Shahul South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 05 /
RADEMACHER, Peter Michael South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | 06 /
YEE, Calvin Wesley South San Francisco, California 94080 / US | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/10] | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 21726289.8 | 28.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021US29574 | Priority number, date | US202063016891P | 28.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063016891 P | US202063127774P | 18.12.2020 Original published format: US 202063127774 P | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021222363 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4143178 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/04, C07D401/14, C07D403/04, C07D405/14, C07D413/14, C07D417/04, C07D417/14, C07D471/04, C07D491/056, C07D513/04, A61P3/00, A61P7/00, A61P13/00, A61P35/00, A61K31/517 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/444 (KR);
A61K31/517 (KR);
A61K31/55 (KR);
A61K31/553 (KR);
A61P13/00 (EP,IL);
A61P13/12 (KR);
A61P3/00 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
A61P7/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07D403/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D403/14 (US);
C07D405/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D413/04 (KR,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D417/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07D471/08 (US);
C07D491/056 (EP,IL,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | CYCLOALKYLPYRIMIDINE ALS FERROPORTININHIBITOREN | [2023/10] | English: | CYCLOALKYL PYRIMIDINES AS FERROPORTIN INHIBITORS | [2023/10] | French: | PYRIMIDINES CYCLOALKYLIQUES UTILISÉES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE LA FERROPORTINE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 22.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0407899 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,69-102 * page 53; example 102.1 * * claim - *; | [X]WO2005014558 (VERTEX PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 1,69-102 * compound 102 * * claim - *; | [A]WO2011026835 (VIFOR INT AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-103 * example - ** claim - *; | [X]WO2019222238 (ARBUTUS BIOPHARMA INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8,21,28,102 * example 94 * * claim - *; | [AP]WO2020123850 (GLOBAL BLOOD THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [AP] 1-103 * example - * * claim - * | by applicant | US3845770 | US4326525 | US4902514 | US4992445 | US5001139 | US5023252 | US5616345 | WO2010065815 | WO2013086143 | CN104011066 | WO2014145561 | WO2015042515 | WO2015157283 | WO2015200916 | US9315545 | WO2016109363 | WO2018192973 | - M.W. HENTZE, "Balancing acts: molecular control of mammalian iron metabolism", Cell, (20040000), vol. 1, no. 17, pages 285 - 297 | - KRAUSE et al., FEBS Lett, (20000000), vol. 480, pages 147 - 150 | - JORDAN et al., J Biol Chem., (20090000), vol. 284, pages 24155 - 24167 | - NEMETH et al., Blood, (20060000), vol. 107, pages 328 - 333 | - GANZ, Hematol. Am. Soc. Hematol. Educ. Program, (20060000), vol. 507, pages 29 - 35 | - HUNTER et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 37597 - 37603 | - PARK et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20010000), vol. 276, pages 7806 - 7810 | - SEBASTIANI et al., Front. Pharmacol., (20160000), vol. 7, page 160 | - BLANCHETTE et al., Expert Rev. Hematol., (20160000), vol. 9, pages 169 - 186 | - POWELL et al., The Lancet, (20160000), vol. 388, pages 706 - 716 | - ORIGA et al., Haematologica, (20070000), vol. 92, pages 583 - 588 | - CASU et al., Blood, (20160000), vol. 128, pages 265 - 276 | - CARREAU et al., Blood Rev, (20160000), vol. 30, pages 349 - 356 | - TEMRAZ et al., Crit. Rev. Oncol. Hematol., (20140000), vol. 91, pages 64 - 73 | - WALTER et al., Acta Haematol., (20090000), vol. 122, pages 174 - 183 | - CUI et al., Leuk. Res., (20140000), vol. 38, pages 545 - 550 | - SANTINI et al., PLoS ONE, (20110000), vol. 6, page e23109 | - WALKERAGARWAL, Nephrol, (20160000), vol. 36, pages 62 - 70 | - AREZES et al., Cell Host Microbe, (20150000), vol. 17, pages 47 - 57 | - ZENG et al., Anesthesiology, (20150000), vol. 122, pages 374 - 386 | - PREZA et al., J. Clin. Invest., (20110000), vol. 121, no. 12, pages 4880 - 4888 | - FOSTER, "Deuterium Isotope Effects in Studies of Drug Metabolism", Trends Pharmacol. Sci., (19840000), vol. 5, no. 12, doi:10.1016/0165-6147(84)90534-0, pages 524 - 527, XP025943358 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0165-6147(84)90534-0 | - "Pro-drugs as Novel Delivery Systems", T. HIGUCHIV. STELLA, Design of Prodrugs, Elsevier, (19850000), vol. 14 | - Remington's Pharmaceutical Sciences, Mace Publishing Co., (19850000), vol. 9, pages 1910 - 16 | - YULIN ZHAO et al., "MEK1/2 inhibitors reverse acute vascular occlusion in mouse models of sickle cell disease", The FASEB Journal, (20160000), vol. 30, no. 3, pages 1171 - 1186 | - KHALID et al., "Kidney ischaemia reperfusion injury in the rat the EGTI scoring system as a valid and reliable tool for histological assessment", Journal of Histology & Histopatholoy, (20160000), vol. 3 | - Comprehensive Heterocyclic Chemistry II, Elsevier, (19970000), vol. 3 | - Helvetica Chimica Acta, (19580000), vol. 41, pages 1052 - 60 | - Arzneimittel-Forschung, (19900000), vol. 40, no. 12, pages 1328 - 31 | - LOUIS F. FIESERMARY FIESER, Reagents for Organic Synthesis, Wiley, (19670000), vol. 1-23 |