EP4125315 - GPS LOCATION AUGMENTATION AND OUTAGE PLAYTHROUGH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kinze Manufacturing, Inc. 2172 M Avenue Williamsburg, IA 52361-0806 / US | [2023/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOON, Jason Williamsburg, Iowa 52361-0806 / US | 02 /
NADKE, Jeremy Williamsburg, Iowa 52361-0806 / US | 03 /
MCMAHAN, Ryan Williamsburg, Iowa 52361-0806 / US | 04 /
MOELLER, Matthew Williamsburg, Iowa 52361-0806 / US | [2023/06] | Representative(s) | Wood, Graham Bailey Walsh & Co LLP 1 York Place Leeds, LS1 2DR / GB | [2023/06] | Application number, filing date | 21726796.2 | 30.04.2021 | [2023/06] | WO2021US30091 | Priority number, date | US202062704284P | 01.05.2020 Original published format: US 202062704284 P | US202062704285P | 01.05.2020 Original published format: US 202062704285 P | US202063018833P | 01.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063018833 P | US202063019032P | 01.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063019032 P | [2023/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021222705 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4125315 | Date: | 08.02.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A01B79/00 | [2023/06] | CPC: |
A01B79/005 (EP,US);
A01C21/005 (US);
G01S19/47 (US);
G05D1/0077 (US);
G05D1/0219 (US);
G05D1/0231 (US);
G05D1/027 (US);
G05D1/0278 (US);
G05D1/0287 (US);
G05D1/101 (US);
G05D1/24 (US);
G05D1/247 (US);
G05D1/248 (US);
G05D1/249 (US);
G05D1/648 (US);
G05D1/692 (US);
G05D1/87 (US);
G06F16/168 (US);
G06F16/1744 (US);
G06F16/1748 (US);
G06F16/176 (US);
G06F3/0641 (US);
G06F3/0643 (US);
H04W76/14 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] | Title | German: | GPS-STANDORTERGÄNZUNG UND AUSFALL-DURCHSPIELUNG | [2023/06] | English: | GPS LOCATION AUGMENTATION AND OUTAGE PLAYTHROUGH | [2023/06] | French: | RENFORCEMENT DE LOCALISATION GPS ET TRAVERSÉE D'UNE INDISPONIBILITÉ DE GPS | [2023/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/06] | 26.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US5878371 (HALE GEORGE H [US], et al); | [Y]WO2015120470 (PREC PLANTING LLC [US]); | [X]US2016366815 (GUYETTE GREG [US], et al); | [Y]US2017315555 (SUGUMARAN RAMANATHAN [US], et al) | by applicant | US10104824 | US10575453 | US10952365 |