EP4159001 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR REMOVING AT LEAST ONE PORTION OF AT LEAST ONE COATING SYSTEM PRESENT IN A MULTI-GLAZED WINDOW MOUNTED ON A STATIONARY OR MOBILE OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 31.05.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Avenue Jean Monnet 4 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | For all designated states AGC Inc. Shin Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | For all designated states AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. 11175 Cicero Drive, Suite 400 Alpharetta, 30022-1167 / US | For all designated states AGC Vidros do Brasil Ltda. Estrada Municipal Doutor Jaime Eduardo Ribeiro Pereira, No 500, Jardim Vista Alegre CEP 12523-671 Guaratinguetá, São Paulo / BR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | For all designated states AGC Glass Europe Avenue Jean Monnet 4 1348 Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | ||
For all designated states AGC Inc. Shin Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | |||
For all designated states AGC Flat Glass North America, Inc. 11175 Cicero Drive, Suite 400 Alpharetta, 30022-1167 / US | |||
For all designated states AGC Vidros do Brasil Ltda. Estrada Municipal Doutor Jaime Eduardo Ribeiro Pereira, No 500, Jardim Vista Alegre Guaratingueta Sao Paulo, CEP 12523-671 / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORGANTE, Eric 6041 Gosselies / BE | 02 /
MONVILLE, Bernard 5380 Fernelmont / BE | 03 /
CASTEX, Simon 6041 Gosselies / BE | 04 /
LEMOINE, Adrien 1490 Court-Saint-Etienne / BE | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | AGC Glass Europe Technovation Centre Intellectual Property Department Rue Louis Blériot 12 6041 Gosselies / BE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21726928.1 | 21.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021EP63595 | Priority number, date | EP20200176593 | 26.05.2020 Original published format: EP 20176593 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021239597 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159001 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/86, C03C23/00, B23K26/02, B23K26/042, B23K26/08, B23K26/082, B23K26/362 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H05B3/86 (EP,US);
B23K26/402 (US);
B23K26/048 (US);
B23K26/082 (EP,US);
B23K26/0884 (US);
B23K26/362 (EP);
C03C17/00 (US);
B23K2103/54 (US);
C03C2218/328 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN MINDESTENS EINES TEILS MINDESTENS EINES BESCHICHTUNGSSYSTEMS IN EINEM AUF EINEM STATIONÄREN ODER MOBILEN OBJEKT MONTIERTEN MEHRFACHVERGLASUNGSFENSTER | [2023/14] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR REMOVING AT LEAST ONE PORTION OF AT LEAST ONE COATING SYSTEM PRESENT IN A MULTI-GLAZED WINDOW MOUNTED ON A STATIONARY OR MOBILE OBJECT | [2023/14] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION D'AU MOINS UNE PARTIE D'AU MOINS UN SYSTÈME DE REVÊTEMENT PRÉSENT DANS UNE FENÊTRE À VITRES MULTIPLES MONTÉE SUR UN OBJET FIXE OU MOBILE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 02.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US6559411 (BORGESON FRANK A [US], et al) [XD] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 58 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2, line 62 - line 64 * * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 28 * * column 5, line 24 - column 6, line 40 * * figures 1-13 *; | [XA]EP1340585 (RETAINAGROUP LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,5-11,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0093] * * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0119] - paragraph [0120] * * figures 1-9 * [A] 3,4,12,13; | [I]US2004182839 (DENNEY PAUL E [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0076] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0092] * * paragraph [0095] - paragraph [0109] * * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0111] ** figures 1-15 *; | [XA]US2005016955 (DEROSSETT THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10,12-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1-7 * [A] 5-7,11; | [XA]US2008000886 (BELL JOHN T [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5-11,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0065] - paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0093] * * figures 1-6 * [A] 3,4,12,13; | [XA]US2013295300 (PAULUS PETER [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-11,14 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0049] * * figures 1(a,b)-6(a,b) * [A] 3,4,12,13; | [XD]WO2015050762 (ERITEK INC [US]) [XD] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2017327420 (SCHULZ VALENTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0128] * * figures 1(A-C)-8(A,B) * | by applicant | US6559411 | WO2015050762 |