EP4147328 - ELECTRICAL MACHINE HAVING A SEGMENTED STATOR OR ROTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEMISSIE, Edom Sheffield S10 1QD / GB | 02 /
AZAR, Ziad Sheffield South Yorkshire S10 4ED / GB | 03 /
DUKE, Alexander Sheffield S10 5SN / GB | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/11] | SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21727156.8 | 21.05.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021EP63654 | Priority number, date | EP20200183109 | 30.06.2020 Original published format: EP 20183109 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022002484 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4147328 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/14, H02K7/18, H02K15/00, H02K21/22, H02K3/18, H02K3/52, H02K15/02, H02K15/06, H02K3/487 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
H02K1/148 (EP,US);
H02K1/16 (US);
H02K15/0018 (EP);
H02K15/022 (EP);
H02K15/063 (EP);
H02K21/22 (EP);
H02K3/18 (EP);
H02K3/487 (EP,US);
H02K3/522 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINE MIT SEGMENTIERTEM STATOR ODER ROTOR | [2023/11] | English: | ELECTRICAL MACHINE HAVING A SEGMENTED STATOR OR ROTOR | [2023/11] | French: | MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE À STATOR OU ROTOR SEGMENTÉ | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 08.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102010039590 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,7,13 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0042]; figures 1, 2 ** paragraph [0001] *; | [XI]EP3444930 (SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY AS [DK]) [X] 1-3,5,12-15 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0045]; figures 1-6 * [I] 6,7,11; | [XAI]EP3648305 (SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY AS [DK]) [X] 1-3,12-15 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015]; figures 1-4 * [A] 4,8-10 [I] 11 |