EP4158352 - METHOD AND KIT FOR THE EARLY DETECTION OF SEPSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Loop Diagnostics, S.L. Santa Maria, 4 - 5 42001 Soria / ES | For all designated states Fundació Institut d'Investigació Biomèdica de Bellvitge (IDIBELL) Hospital Duran i Reynals 2ª planta, Av. Gran Via, 199-203 08908 Hospitalet de Llobregat, Barcelona / ES | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERNÁNDEZ JIMÉNEZ, Enrique 08028 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
JANSEN, Raoul 6336 XV Hulsberg / NL | 03 /
SABATER RIERA, Joan 08908 L'Hospitalet de Llobregat, Barcelona / ES | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21727499.2 | 31.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021EP64544 | Priority number, date | EP20200382462 | 01.06.2020 Original published format: EP 20382462 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021245025 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4158352 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N33/6869 (US);
G01N2333/52 (EP,US);
G01N2400/50 (EP,US);
G01N2800/26 (EP,US);
G01N2800/382 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND KIT ZUM FRÜHEN NACHWEIS VON SEPSIS | [2023/14] | English: | METHOD AND KIT FOR THE EARLY DETECTION OF SEPSIS | [2023/14] | French: | MÉTHODE ET TROUSSE DE DÉTECTION PRÉCOCE DE SEPTICÉMIE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 16.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5262296 (OGAWA ETSUKO [JP], et al) [A] 14 * claim 6 *; | [Y]US2004106142 (IVEY RICHARD M [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,10 * [0066];; table 1 *; | [A] - HARRY MOSCOVITZ ET AL, "Plasma cytokine determinations in emergency department patients as a predictor of bacteremi and infectious disease severity :", CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE., US, (19940701), vol. 22, no. 7, doi:10.1097/00003246-199407000-00009, ISSN 0090-3493, pages 1102 - 1107, XP055747031 [A] 1-7,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/00003246-199407000-00009 | [A] - TRAVIS L. HOLLOWAY ET AL, "Toll-like receptor responses are suppressed in trauma ICU patients", JOURNAL OF SURGICAL RESEARCH., US, (20161101), vol. 206, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.jss.2016.06.056, ISSN 0022-4804, pages 139 - 145, XP055748273 [A] 14 * (p 141, col 1, para 2) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jss.2016.06.056 | [A] - MILENA KARINA COLÓ BRUNIALTI ET AL, "Influence of EDTA and heparin on lipopolysaccharide binding and cell activation, evaluated at single-cell level in whole blood : LPS Interaction and Cell Activation in WB", CYTOMETRY, US, (20020215), vol. 50, no. 1, doi:10.1002/cyto.10049, ISSN 0196-4763, pages 14 - 18, XP055748274 [A] 14 * (p 15, col 1, para 3) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.10049 | [A] - SZODORAY P ET AL, "CORCULATING CYTOKINES IN PRIMARY SJOGREN'S SYNDROME DETERMINED BY A MULTIPLEX CYTOKINE ARRAY SYSTEM", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, BLACKWELL SCIENCE PUBL., OXFORD, GB, (20040601), vol. 59, no. 6, doi:10.1111/J.0300-9475.2004.01432.X, ISSN 0300-9475, pages 592 - 599, XP001204356 [A] 14 * (p 593, col 2, para 1) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.0300-9475.2004.01432.x | [Y] - JESSICA Z. KUBICEK-SUTHERLAND ET AL, "Direct detection of bacteremia by exploiting host-pathogen interactions of lipoteichoic acid and lipopolysaccharide", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20190417), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-019-42502-5, XP055748276 [Y] 1-25,28-44 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-019-42502-5 | [Y] - KATHRYN E HALLY ET AL, "Platelets regulate leucocyte responses to Toll-like receptor stimulation", CLINICAL & TRANSLATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY, GB, (20180101), vol. 7, no. 7, doi:10.1002/cti2.1036, ISSN 2050-0068, page e1036, XP055746116 [Y] 1-25,28-44 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cti2.1036 | [Y] - SALOMAO REINALDO ET AL, "Lipopolysaccharide-cell interaction and induced cellular activation in whole blood of septic patients", JOURNAL OF ENDOTOXIN RESEARCH, UK, (20021001), vol. 8, no. 5, doi:10.1179/096805102125000704, ISSN 0968-0519, pages 371 - 379, XP055829747 [Y] 1-25,28-44 * (p 372, col 2, first lines)(p 377, col 2, last para);; figure 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1179/096805102125000704 | [Y] - GUADALUPE MARTIN ET AL, "Role of plasma matrix-metalloproteases (MMPs) and their polymorphisms (SNPs) in sepsis development and outcome in ICU patients", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20140516), vol. 4, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep05002, XP055748226 [Y] 7,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep05002 | [Y] - PING ZHANG ET AL, "The Lineage-c-Kit+Sca-1+ Cell Response to Escherichia coli Bacteremia in Balb/c Mice", STEM CELLS (MIAMISBURG), (20080701), vol. 26, no. 7, doi:10.1634/stemcells.2007-1027, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 1778 - 1786, XP055748277 [Y] 7,10 * page 1183 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2007-1027 | [Y] - SANNE VAN DEN BERG ET AL, "Distinctive Cytokines as Biomarkers Predicting Fatal Outcome of Severe Staphylococcus aureus Bacteremia in Mice", PLOS ONE, (20130301), vol. 8, no. 3, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0059107, page e59107, XP055748178 [Y] 7,10 * p 3, col 1, para 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0059107 | [Y] - CHIA-TE KUNG ET AL, "Serum adhesion molecules as predictors of bacteremia in adult severe sepsis patients at the emergency department", CLINICA CHIMICA ACTA, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20130601), vol. 421, doi:10.1016/j.cca.2013.02.023, ISSN 0009-8981, pages 116 - 120, XP055748235 [Y] 7,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cca.2013.02.023 | [Y] - DANFENG XU ET AL, "Brain-derived neurotrophic factor is regulated via MyD88/NF-[kappa]B signaling in experimental Streptococcus pneumoniae meningitis", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20170614), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-017-03861-z, XP055748241 [Y] 7,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-017-03861-z | [Y] - CHEN JINWU ET AL, "Coagulation factors VII, IX and X are effective antibacterial proteins against drug-resistant Gram-negative bacteria", CELL RESEARCH, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, CN, vol. 29, no. 9, doi:10.1038/S41422-019-0202-3, ISSN 1001-0602, (20190809), pages 711 - 724, (20190809), XP036875198 [Y] 7,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41422-019-0202-3 | [Y] - BOSMANN M ET AL, "Therapeutic potential of targeting IL-17 and IL-23 in sepsis", CLINICAL AND TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR TRANSLATIONAL MEDICINE, SE, (20120427), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1186/2001-1326-1-4, ISSN 2001-1326, pages 4 - 1, XP002717294 [Y] 7,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/2001-1326-1-4 | by applicant | US347 | US6303 | US4436727 | US4477575 | US4866034 | US4877611 | US4912094 | US5166051 | US5480792 | US5525524 | US5631171 | US5679526 | US5824799 | WO9850399 | US5851776 | US5885527 | US5922615 | US5939272 | US5947124 | US5955377 | US5985579 | US6019944 | US6113855 | US6143576 | US6391265 | WO03011223 | WO03099195 | US6764840 | US7125493 | - DELLINGER et al., Intensive Care Med, (20130000), vol. 39, pages 165 - 228 | - COBURN et al., JAMA, (20120000), vol. 308, pages 502 - 511 | - TANG et al., Lancet Infect Dis, (20070000), vol. 7, pages 210 - 217 | - UZZAN et al., Crit Care Med, (20060000), vol. 34, pages 1996 - 2003 | - CHEVAL et al., Intensive Care Med, (20000000), vol. 26, pages 153 - 158 | - UGARTE et al., Crit Care Med, (19990000), vol. 27, pages 498 - 504 | - VEGA et al., Crit Care Med, (20090000), vol. 37, pages 1806 - 1807 | - KIRCHHOFER et al., Arterioscler. Thromb. Vase. Biol., (19950000), vol. 15, pages 1098 - 1106 | - KIRCHHOFER et al., J. Clin. Invest., (19940000), vol. 93, pages 2073 - 83 | - SABROE et al., JI, (20030000), pages 1630 - 5 | - "Swiss-Prot", Database accession no. 000206 | - FENG Y et al., Nat Commun, (20190522), vol. 10, no. 1, page 2272 | - "database", Database accession no. ENSG00000226979 | - JAYESH M. BHATT, European Respiratory Review, (20130000), vol. 22, pages 205 - 2016 | - WATERS VRATJEN F, Ann Am Thorac Soc, (20151100), vol. 12, pages 200 - 6 | - FUCHS et al., N Engl J Med., (19940908), vol. 331, no. 10, pages 637 - 42 | - TREGGIARI et al., Contemp Clin Trials, (20090000), vol. 30, pages 256 - 268 | - FISCHER, Intensive Care Med, (20030000), vol. 29, pages 1043 - 51 |