EP4139513 - WASHING MACHINE BELT PULLEY MADE OF A PLASTIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.09.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gorenje gospodinjski aparati, d.o.o. Partizanska cesta 12 3320 Velenje / SI | [2024/36] |
Former [2023/09] | For all designated states Gorenje Gospodinjski Aparati, d.o.o. Partizanska cesta 12 3320 Velenje / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CEPON, Gregor Slovenska cesta 2 1354 Horjul / SI | 02 /
KOREN, Uros Rozna cesta 10 3313 Polzela / SI | 03 /
STARC, Blaz Gornje Lepovce 104 1310 Ribnica / SI | 04 /
MIHELIC, Ales Stihova 3 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 05 /
POGOREVC, Robi Tolsti vrh 40a 2382 Mislinja / SI | 06 /
BOLTEZAR, Miha Matjanova pot 19 1000 Ljubljana / SI | 07 /
KATANEC, Joze Lokovica 73 3325 Sostanj / SI | [2024/36] |
Former [2023/09] | 01 /
CEPON, Gregor Slovenska cesta 2 1354 Horjul / SI | ||
02 /
KOREN, Uros Rozna cesta 10 3313 Polzela / SI | |||
03 /
STARC, Blaz Gornje Lepovce 104 1310 Ribnica / SI | |||
04 /
MIHELIC, Ales Stihova 3 1000 Ljubljana / SI | |||
05 /
POGOREVC, Robi Tolsti vrh 40a 2382 Mislinja / SI | |||
06 /
BOLTEZAR, Miha Matjanova pot 19 1000 Ljubljana / SI | |||
07 /
KATANEC, Joze Lokovica 73 3325 o tanj / SI | Representative(s) | Golmajer Zima, Marjanca Patentna pisarna d.o.o. Copova 14 1000 Ljubljana / SI | [2023/09] | Application number, filing date | 21727539.5 | 19.04.2021 | [2023/09] | WO2021IB53190 | Priority number, date | SI20200000070 | 21.04.2020 Original published format: SI 202000070 | [2023/09] | Filing language | SL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021214618 | Date: | 28.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4139513 | Date: | 01.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D06F37/26, D06F37/20, D06F37/30, F16H55/48 | [2023/09] | CPC: |
D06F37/264 (EP);
D06F37/30 (EP,US);
F16H55/48 (EP,US);
D06F37/206 (EP);
D06F37/269 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] | Title | German: | WASCHMASCHINEN-RIEMENSCHEIBE AUS EINEM KUNSTSTOFFMATERIAL | [2024/16] | English: | WASHING MACHINE BELT PULLEY MADE OF A PLASTIC MATERIAL | [2023/09] | French: | POULIE DE COURROIE DE MACHINE À LAVER EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE | [2024/16] |
Former [2023/09] | RIEMENSCHEIBE AUS KUNSTSTOFF FÜR EINE WASCHMASCHINE | ||
Former [2023/09] | POULIE À COURROIE DE MACHINE À LAVER CONSTITUÉE D'UN MATÉRIAU PLASTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 15.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 31.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE19756516 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [A]ITAN20100041 (MECCANICA GENERALE SRL); | [I]EP2756125 (MECCANICA GENERALE SRL [IT]); | [I]CN106958118 (WUXI LITTLE SWAN CO LTD) |