EP4142909 - FILTER CARTRIDGE AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc. 555 Paper Mill Road Newark, DE 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2023/33] | For all designated states W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. 555 Paper Mill Rd. Newark, DE 19711 / US | ||
Former [2023/10] | For all designated states W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc. 555 Paper Mill Road Newark DE 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRESSWELL, Kevin J. Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | 02 /
FRIEDMAN, Nathan L. Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | 03 /
SOKEL, Justin W. Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21727964.5 | 27.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021US29433 | Priority number, date | US202063015947P | 27.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063015947 P | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021222276 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4142909 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/21, B01D46/24, B01D46/52 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
B01D46/2414 (EP);
A62B23/02 (US);
A62B18/08 (US);
A62B7/10 (US);
B01D29/21 (EP);
B01D46/52 (EP);
B01D2201/0415 (EP);
B01D2201/291 (EP);
B01D2201/4015 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | FILTERPATRONE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2023/10] | English: | FILTER CARTRIDGE AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING | [2023/10] | French: | CARTOUCHE FILTRANTE ET SES PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 06.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 06.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 06.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US3367508 (ERNEST BUCKMAN KENNETH, et al) [X] 22 * column 2, line 3 - column 4, line 3; figure 3 * [Y] 2,3 [I] 1; | [X]FR2259636 (LABINAL [FR]) [X] 22 * page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 30 *; | [XY]WO9509037 (FLEETGUARD INC [US]) [X] 1,22 * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 15 * * page 21, lines 18-21 * [Y] 2,3,5,6,13-15; | [A]WO2008086304 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15,22* page 5, line 3 - page 7, line 7 *; | [XY]US2017106314 (STAMEY JR WILLIE L [US], et al) [X] 22 * paragraphs [0025] - [0029] * [Y] 5,6,13-15 |