EP4142883 - MINT FLAVOR COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORGAN, George, Kavin, III Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 02 /
SANKER, Lowell, Alan Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 03 /
ANDERSON, Dawn, Louise Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 04 /
HOKE, Steven, Hamilton, II Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | 05 /
LEI, Qingxin Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21727969.4 | 29.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021US29775 | Priority number, date | US202063018520P | 01.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063018520 P | US202063018521P | 01.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063018521 P | US202063018522P | 01.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063018522 P | US202063018523P | 01.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063018523 P | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021222488 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4142883 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q11/00, A61K8/30, A23L27/20 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP);
A23L27/2026 (US);
A23L27/10 (EP);
A23L27/202 (EP);
A23L27/203 (EP,US);
A23L27/2052 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Title | German: | MINZGESCHMACKSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2023/10] | English: | MINT FLAVOR COMPOSITIONS | [2023/10] | French: | COMPOSITIONS D'ARÔME DE MENTHE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 12.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2008005548 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9,11-14,16,17 * page 1, lines 14-17 * * page 3, lines 3-19 * [Y] 1-17; | [YA]US2014271940 (WURZER JOSHUA H [US]) [Y] 17 * paragraphs [0013] , [0030] , [0035] , [0085] , [0086] *[A] 1-16; | [XY]US2017281493 (HOKE STEVEN HAMILTON [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-14,16,17 * page 1, paragraph 14 * * pages 8-9, paragraph 58 * * example .; table 9 * [Y] 1-17 | by applicant | US5372824 | US2012014883 | - J. ROHLOFF, "Monoterpene Composition of Essential Oil from Peppermint (Mentha x piperita L.) with Regard to Leaf Position Using Solid-Phase Microextraction and Gas Chromatography/Mass Spectrometry Analysis", J. Agric. Food Chem., (19990000), vol. 47, pages 3782 - 3786 | - W.M. COLEMANIII, B.M. LAWRENCES.K. COLE, "Semiquantitative Determination of Off-Notes in Mint Oils by Solid-Phase Microextraction", J. Chromatogr. Sci., (20020000), vol. 40, pages 133 - 139 | - M.L. RUIZ DEL CASTILLOG.P. BLANCHM. HERRAIZ, "Natural Variability of Enantiomeric Composition of Bioactive Chiral Terpenes in Mentha Piperita", J. Chromatogr. A, (20040000), vol. 1054, doi:10.1016/j.chroma.2004.08.055, pages 87 - 93, XP004607003 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chroma.2004.08.055 | - "The Composition of Commercially Important Mints", B.M. LAWRENCE, Mint The genus Mentha, CRC Press, Taylor & Francis Group, (20070000), pages 217 - 324 | - J. ROHLOFF, J. Agric. Food Chem., (19990000), vol. 47, pages 3782 - 3786 | - W.M. COLEMAN et al., J. Chromatogr. Sci., (20020000), vol. 40, pages 133 - 139 |