EP4342097 - BEAM TRAINING OF A RECEIVER DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.11.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | 26.07.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALANTARI, Ashkan 21127 Malmö / SE | 02 /
BALAKRISHNAN, Bipin 21535 Malmö / SE | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Valea AB Box 1098 405 23 Göteborg / SE | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 21728054.4 | 21.05.2021 | [2024/13] | WO2021EP63653 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022242876 | Date: | 24.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4342097 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/08 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
H04B7/088 (EP);
H04B7/06952 (US);
H04B17/328 (US);
H04B7/0617 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | STRAHLTRAINING EINER EMPFÄNGERVORRICHTUNG | [2024/13] | English: | BEAM TRAINING OF A RECEIVER DEVICE | [2024/13] | French: | CONDITIONNEMENT DE FAISCEAUX D'UN DISPOSITIF RÉCEPTEUR | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 21.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2021050892 (PARK SUNGWOO [US], et al); | [XI]US2021058131 (ZHU DALIN [US], et al) |