EP4146833 - DIAGNOSTIC PRIMERS, KITS AND METHODS FOR VIRAL DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genomtec SA Bierutowska 57-59 51-317 Wroclaw / PL | [2023/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOKARSKI, Miron 49-300 Brzeg / PL | 02 /
PIELKA, Izabela 42-274 Konopiska / PL | 03 /
MALODOBRA-MAZUR, Malgorzata 51-354 Wroclaw / PL | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Keltie LLP No. 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 21728437.1 | 05.05.2021 | [2023/11] | WO2021EP61918 | Priority number, date | GB20200006663 | 05.05.2020 Original published format: GB 202006663 | GB20200006664 | 05.05.2020 Original published format: GB 202006664 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021224355 | Date: | 11.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4146833 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/70, C12Q1/6844 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
C12Q1/701 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6844 (EP);
C12Q2600/118 (EP);
C12Q2600/16 (US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6844, C12Q2527/107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/11] | Title | German: | DIAGNOSTISCHE PRIMER, KITS UND VERFAHREN FÜR DEN NACHWEIS VON VIREN | [2023/11] | English: | DIAGNOSTIC PRIMERS, KITS AND METHODS FOR VIRAL DETECTION | [2023/11] | French: | AMORCES DE DIAGNOSTIC, KITS ET PROCÉDÉS DE DÉTECTION VIRALE | [2023/11] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/11] | 17.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO0028082 | WO0177317 | WO0224902 | CN102286637 | US8389221 | CN103146847 |