EP4158221 - CABLE CONVEYOR BELT JUNCTION DEVICE PROVIDED WITH CABLE LOCKING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FP Business Invest Rue Michel Rondet ZI du Clos Marquet 42400 Saint-Chamond / FR | [2024/26] |
Former [2023/14] | For all designated states FP Business Invest Rue Michel Rondet ZI du Clos Marquet 42400 Saint-Chamond / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAVERNIER, Bernard 42500 Le Chambon Feugerolles / FR | 02 /
GUILLEMET, Frédéric 69300 Caluire et Cuire / FR | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Bringer IP 1, Place du Président Thomas Wilson 31000 Toulouse / FR | [2024/26] |
Former [2023/14] | Alatis 3 rue Paul Escudier 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 21728582.4 | 29.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021EP64465 | Priority number, date | FR20200005721 | 29.05.2020 Original published format: FR 2005721 | [2023/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021240008 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4158221 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4158221 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16G11/04, F16G3/08, F16G11/06, F16G3/10 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
F16G3/08 (EP,IL,US);
F16G11/048 (EP,IL);
F16G11/06 (EP,IL);
F16G3/10 (EP,IL)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 23.11.2022 | TN | 23.11.2022 | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR KABELFÖRDERBAND MIT KABELVERRIEGELUNGSELEMENTEN | [2023/14] | English: | CABLE CONVEYOR BELT JUNCTION DEVICE PROVIDED WITH CABLE LOCKING ELEMENTS | [2023/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE JONCTION DE BANDE TRANSPORTEUSE A CÂBLES MUNI D'ELEMENTS DE BLOCAGE DE CÂBLE | [2024/04] |
Former [2023/14] | DISPOSITIF DE JONCTION DE BANDE TRANSPORTEUSE À CABLES MUNI D'ÉLÉMENTS DE BLOCAGE DE CABLE | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 23.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB191517364 (APPLEYARD ROLLO [GB]); | [A]BE531462 ; | [A]GB2118583 (ALBERTA ENERGY CO LTD, et al); | [A]DE8801165U ; | [A]WO2019071363 (RIQUELME VALENCIA MARCELO NICOLAS [CL]) |