EP4150077 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE ADAR-MEDIATED EDITING OF TRANSMEMBRANE CHANNEL-LIKE PROTEIN 1 (TMC1) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korro Bio, Inc. One Kendall Square Building 600-700, Suite 6-401 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JARPE, Matthew Quincy, MA 02170 / US | 02 /
PUTTA, Mallikarjuna, Reddy Lexington, MA 02420 / US | 03 /
FRALEY, Andrew Arlington, MA 02474 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21729192.1 | 13.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021US32171 | Priority number, date | US202063025313P | 15.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063025313 P | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021231685 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4150077 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C12N9/78 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
C12Y305/04004 (EP,US);
C12N15/11 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP);
C12N9/78 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US);
C12N2310/315 (EP,US);
C12N2310/321 (US);
C12N2310/323 (EP);
C12N2310/332 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3531 (EP);
C12N2310/322, C12N2310/3533 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ADAR-VERMITTELTEN BEARBEITUNG VON TRANSMEMBRANKANALÄHNLICHEM PROTEIN 1 (TMC1) | [2023/12] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE ADAR-MEDIATED EDITING OF TRANSMEMBRANE CHANNEL-LIKE PROTEIN 1 (TMC1) | [2023/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR L'ÉDITION MÉDIÉE PAR ADAR DE LA PROTÉINE 1 DE TYPE CANAL TRANSMEMBRANAIRE (TMC1) | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 21.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2016069910 (MASSACHUSETTS EYE & EAR INFIRM [US]) [I] 1-147 * page 28; figure 8; example 2 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017220751 (PROQR THERAPEUTICS II BV [NL]) [A] 1-147 * example 5; claims 1-19 * * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018041973 (PROQR THERAPEUTICS II BV [NL]) [A] 1-147 * figure 2; examples 1, 2; claims 1-18 * * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2019005884 (BROAD INST INC [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * paragraph [1061] - paragraph [1063]; figures 1-3; claims 1-8, 17, 20-22, 26-28, 31 * * the whole document * [I] 20-147; | [A]WO2019158475 (PROQR THERAPEUTICS II BV [NL]) [A] 1-147 * figures 1-3, 7; example 4; claims 1-12 * * the whole document *; | [I] - GAO XUE ET AL, "Treatment of autosomal dominant hearing loss by in vivo delivery of genome editing agents", NATURE, London, (20171220), vol. 553, no. 7687, doi:10.1038/nature25164, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 217 - 221, XP055776079 [I] 1-147 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature25164 | [I] - GYÖRGY BENCE ET AL, "Allele-specific gene editing prevents deafness in a model of dominant progressive hearing loss", NATURE MEDICINE, NATURE PUB. CO, NEW YORK, vol. 25, no. 7, doi:10.1038/S41591-019-0500-9, ISSN 1078-8956, (20190703), pages 1123 - 1130, (20190703), XP036901105 [I] 1-147 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41591-019-0500-9 | [A] - LEANNA R. MONTELEONE ET AL, "A Bump-Hole Approach for Directed RNA Editing", CELL CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20181220), vol. 26, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.chembiol.2018.10.025, ISSN 2451-9456, pages 269 - 277.e5, XP055703024 [A] 1-147 * figure 2 * * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.chembiol.2018.10.025 | [A] - MONTIEL-GONZALEZ MARIA FERNANDA ET AL, "Current strategies for Site-Directed RNA Editing using ADARs", METHODS, (20181129), vol. 156, doi:10.1016/J.YMETH.2018.11.016, ISSN 1046-2023, pages 16 - 24, XP085614419 [A] 1-147 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymeth.2018.11.016 | by applicant | US513030 | US564562 | US3687808 | US4469863 | US4476301 | US4522811 | US4587044 | US4605735 | US4667025 | US4683202 | WO8804924 | US4762779 | US4789737 | US4824941 | US4828979 | US4835263 | US4837028 | US4845205 | US4876335 | US4897355 | US4904582 | US4948882 | US4958013 | US4981957 | US5023243 | US5034506 | WO9116024 | US5082830 | US5109124 | US5112963 | US5118800 | US5118802 | US5134066 | US5138045 | US5166315 | US5171678 | US5175273 | US5177195 | US5185444 | US5188897 | US5214134 | US5214136 | US5216141 | US5218105 | US5235033 | US5245022 | US5254469 | US5258506 | US5262536 | US5264423 | US5264564 | WO9324640 | US5272250 | US5276019 | WO9400569 | US5278302 | US5283185 | WO9402595 | US5286717 | US5292873 | US5317098 | US5319080 | US5321131 | US5359044 | US5367066 | US5371241 | US5391723 | US5393878 | US5399676 | US5405939 | US5405938 | US5414077 | US5416203 | US5432272 | US5434257 | US5445934 | US5446137 | US5451463 | US5453496 | US5455233 | US5457187 | US5459255 | US5466677 | US5466786 | US5470967 | US5476925 | US5484908 | US5486603 | US5489677 | US5502177 | US5510475 | US5512439 | US5512667 | US5514785 | US5519126 | US5519134 | US5525711 | US5525465 | US5536821 | US5539082 | US5541316 | US5541307 | US5541313 | US5543152 | US5545730 | US5550111 | US5552540 | US5552538 | US5561225 | US5563253 | US5565552 | US5567811 | US5567810 | US5571799 | US5574142 | US5576427 | US5578717 | US5578718 | WO9637194 | US5580731 | US5585481 | WO9640964 | US5587361 | US5587469 | US5587371 | US5591722 | US5591584 | US5594121 | US5596086 | US5596091 | US5595726 | US5597909 | US5597696 | US5599923 | US5599928 | US5602240 | US5608046 | US5610289 | US5610300 | US5614617 | US5618704 | WO9713499 | US5623070 | US5625050 | US5627053 | US5633360 | US5639873 | US5646265 | US5658873 | US5663312 | US5670633 | US5677195 | US5677437 | US5677439 | US5681941 | US5688941 | US5700920 | US5714331 | US5719262 | US5744305 | US5750692 | US5770722 | WO9839359 | US5854033 | US5874219 | WO9914226 | US5976567 | US5981501 | US6015886 | WO0003683 | US6028188 | US6124445 | US6147200 | US6160109 | US6166197 | US6169170 | US6172209 | US6222025 | US6235887 | US6239265 | US6268490 | US6277603 | US6294664 | US6320017 | US6326199 | US6346614 | US6380368 | US6444423 | US6525191 | US6528640 | US6531590 | US6534484 | US6534639 | US6576752 | US6586410 | US6608035 | US6617438 | US6639062 | US6670461 | US6683167 | US6747014 | US6770748 | US6783931 | US2004171570 | US6794499 | US6815432 | US6858225 | US6858715 | US6867294 | US6878805 | US6900297 | US6998484 | US2006058255 | US7015315 | US7034133 | US7037646 | US7041816 | US7045610 | US7053207 | US7084125 | USRE39464E | US7273933 | US7321029 | US2008039618 | US7399845 | US7427605 | US7427672 | US2009012281 | US7495088 | US7569686 | US7741457 | US2010324120 | WO2011005861 | US8022193 | US8030467 | US8058069 | US2011313020 | US8106022 | US8158601 | US2012157511 | US8278283 | US8278425 | US8278426 | US8314227 | WO2012177906 | US2013011922 | WO2013036868 | US2013096289 | US2013190383 | US2013317086 | US2014135376 | WO2014076195 | WO2014179620 | WO2014179627 | US2014342003 | US2015174549 | US2015307554 | US2015335764 | WO2016097212 | US2016230189 | US2016251478 | US2016279256 | US2016369269 | WO2017045381 | WO2017070632 | US2017121454 | WO2018027078 | US2018208924 | WO2018195165 | - MORTON et al., N Engl J Med, (20060000), vol. 354, pages 2151 - 64 | - FORTNUM et al., Br J Audiol, (19970000), vol. 31, pages 409 - 446 | - MORTON et al., Ann N YAcad Sci, (19910000), vol. 630, pages 16 - 31 | - KURIMA et al., Nat Genet., vol. 30, no. 3, pages 277 - 84 | - KAWASHIMA et al., J. Clin. Invest., vol. 121, no. 12, pages 4796 - 809 | - PAN et al., Neuron, (20130807), vol. 79, no. 3, pages 504 - 15 | - PAN et al., Neuron, (20180822), vol. 99, no. 4, pages 736 - 753 | - RIAHI et al., PLoS ONE, vol. 9, no. 6, page e99797 | - KITAJIRI et al., Clin. Genet., vol. 71, no. 2, pages 148 - 52 | - HILGERT et al., J Hum Genet., (20090300), vol. 54, no. 3, pages 188 - 90 | - "NCBI", Database accession no. NM_138691.3 | - KOMOR, A.C. et al., Nature, (20160000), vol. 533, pages 420 - 424 | - GAUDELLI, N.M. et al., Nature, (20170000), vol. 551, pages 464 - 471 | - KOMOR, A.C. et al., Science Advances, (20170000), vol. 3, page eaao4774 | - REES, H.A. et al., Nat Rev Genet., (20180000), vol. 19, no. 12, pages 770 - 788 | - WANG et al., Biochemistry, (20180000), vol. 57, pages 1640 - 1651 | - EIFLER et al., Biochemistry, (20130000), vol. 52, pages 7857 - 7869 | - EGGINGTON et al., Nat. Commun., (20110000), vol. 319, pages 1 - 9 | - HIRAO et al., Accounts of Chemical Research, (20120000), vol. 45, page 2055 | - BERGE et al., J. Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19770000), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - Nuc. Acids Symp. Series, (20080000), vol. 52, pages 133 - 134 | - LANCASTERKNOBLICH, Science, (20140000), vol. 345, no. 6194, page 1247125 | - SALA et al., J Surg Res, (20090000), vol. 156, no. 2, pages 205 - 12 | - SATO et al., Gastroenterology, (20110000), vol. 141, pages 1762 - 72 | - BARANY, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19910000), vol. 88, pages 189 - 193 | - GUATELLI et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 1874 - 1878 | - LETSINGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 6553 - 1177 | - LIZARDI et al., Bio/Technology, (19880000), vol. 6, page 1197 | - AKHTAR S.JULIAN R L., Trends Cell. Biol., (19920000), vol. 2, no. 5, pages 139 - 144 | - SORENSEN, D R. et al., J. Mol. Biol, (20030000), vol. 327, pages 761 - 766 | - VERMA, U N. et al., Clin. Cancer Res., (20030000), vol. 9, pages 1291 - 1300 | - ARNOLD, A S et al., J. Hypertens., (20070000), vol. 25, pages 197 - 205 | - ZIMMERMANN, T S. et al., Nature, (20060000), vol. 441, pages 111 - 114 | - CHIEN, P Y. et al., Cancer Gene Ther., (20050000), vol. 12, pages 321 - 328 | - PAL, A. et al., Int J. Oncol., (20050000), vol. 26, pages 1087 - 1091 | - AIGNER, A., J. Biomed. Biotechnol., (20060000), page 71659 | - LIU, S., Mol. Pharm., (20060000), vol. 3, pages 472 - 487 | - TOMALIA, D A. et al., Biochem. Soc. Trans., (20070000), vol. 35, pages 61 - 67 | - YOO, H. et al., Pharm. Res., (19990000), vol. 16, pages 1799 - 1804 | - FEIGNER, P. L. et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (19870000), vol. 84, pages 7851 - 7855 | - BANGHAM et al., M. Mol. Biol., (19650000), vol. 23, page 238 | - OLSON et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19790000), vol. 557, page 9 | - SZOKA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19780000), vol. 75, page 4194 | - MAYHEW et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19840000), vol. 775, page 169 | - KIM et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19830000), vol. 728, page 339 | - FUKUNAGA et al., Endocrinol, (19840000), vol. 115, page 757 | - MAYER et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19860000), vol. 858, page 161 | - WANG et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (19870000), vol. 147, pages 980 - 985 | - ZHOU et al., Journal of Controlled Release, (19920000), vol. 19, pages 269 - 274 | - FEIGNER, J. Biol. Chem., (19940000), vol. 269, page 2550 | - NABEL, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19930000), vol. 90, page 11307 | - NABEL, Human Gene Ther, (19920000), vol. 3, page 649 | - GERSHON, Biochem., (19930000), vol. 32, page 7143 | - STRAUSS, EMBO J., (19920000), vol. 11, page 417 | - HU et al., S.T.P.Pharma. Sci., (19940000), vol. 4, no. 6, page 466 | - ALLEN et al., FEBS Letters, (19870000), vol. 223, page 42 | - WU et al., Cancer Research, (19930000), vol. 53, page 3765 | - PAPAHADJOPOULOS et al., Ann. N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19870000), vol. 507, page 64 | - GABIZON et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U.S.A., (19880000), vol. 85, page 6949 | - RIEGER, Pharmaceutical Dosage Forms, Marcel Dekker, Inc., (19880000), vol. 1, page 285 | - GAO, X.HUANG, L., Biochim. Biophys. Res. Commun., (19910000), vol. 179, page 280 | - ZHOU, X. et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19910000), vol. 1065, page 8 | - Journal of Drug Targeting, (19920000), vol. 2, pages 405 - 410 | - DU PLESSIS et al., Antiviral Research, (19920000), vol. 18, pages 259 - 265 | - MANNINO, R. J.FOULD-FOGERITE, S., Biotechniques, (19980000), vol. 6, pages 682 - 690 | - ITANI, T. et al., Gene, (19870000), vol. 56, pages 267 - 276 | - NICOLAU, C. et al., Meth. Enzymol., (19870000), vol. 149, pages 157 - 176 | - STRAUBINGER, R. M.PAPAHADJOPOULOS, D., Meth. Enzymol., (19830000), vol. 101, pages 512 - 527 | - ANGUSSPROAT, FEBS, (19930000), vol. 325, no. 1,2, pages 123 - 7 | - MERKLE et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20190000), vol. 37, pages 133 - 8 | - KATREKAR et al., Nature Methods, (20190000), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 239 - 42 | - FUKUDA et al., Scientific Reports, (20170000), vol. 7, page 41478 | - NIELSEN et al., Science, (19910000), vol. 254, pages 1497 - 1500 | - SUMMERTON et al., Antisense Nucleic Acid Drug Dev, (19970000), vol. 7, pages 63 - 70 | - MARTIN et al., Helv. Chin. Acta, (19950000), vol. 78, pages 486 - 504 | - KABANOV et al., FEBS Lett., (19900000), vol. 259, pages 327 - 330 | - ENGLISCH et al., Angewandte Chemie, (19910000), vol. 30, page 613 | - MANOHARAN et al., Biorg. Med. Chem. Let., (19930000), vol. 3, pages 2765 - 2770 | - GRUNWELLER, A. et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (20030000), vol. 31, no. 12, pages 3185 - 3193 | - CHATTOPADHYAYA et al., J. Org. Chem., (20090000), vol. 74, pages 118 - 134 | - FLUITER et al., Mol. Biosyst., (20090000), vol. 10, page 1039 | - LETSINGER et al., Proc. Natl. Acid. Sci. USA, (19890000), vol. 86, pages 6553 - 6556 | - MANOHARAN et al., Biorg. Med. Chem. Let., (19940000), vol. 4, pages 1053 - 1060 | - MANOHARAN et al., Ann. N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19920000), vol. 660, pages 306 - 309 | - OBERHAUSER et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19920000), vol. 20, pages 533 - 538 | - SAISON-BEHMOARAS et al., EMBO J, (19910000), vol. 10, pages 1111 - 1118 | - SVINARCHUK et al., Biochimie, (19930000), vol. 75, pages 49 - 54 | - MANOHARAN et al., Tetrahedron Lett., (19950000), vol. 36, pages 3651 - 3654 | - SHEA et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (19900000), vol. 18, pages 3777 - 3783 | - MANOHARAN et al., Nucleosides & Nucleotides, (19950000), vol. 14, pages 969 - 973 | - MISHRA et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19950000), vol. 1264, pages 229 - 237 | - CROOKE et al., J. Pharmacol. Exp. Ther., (19960000), vol. 277, pages 923 - 937 | - LAM et al., Nature, (19910000), vol. 354, pages 82 - 84 | - SIMEONI et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (20030000), vol. 31, pages 2717 - 2724 | - KUBO, T. et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm, (20070000), vol. 365, no. 1, pages 54 - 61 | - MANOHARAN et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Lett., (19940000), vol. 4, page 1053 | - MANOHARAN et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem. Let., (19930000), vol. 3, page 2765 | - SAISON-BEHMOARAS et al., EMBO J., (19910000), vol. 10, page 111 | US20160610186 | US20110610186 | US19480610397 | US19870610470 | WO2007US80331 | WO2016US58344 |