EP4158682 - TOOL FOR HANDLING SUBSTRATES WITH OVERHEAD SCREEN AND RELEVANT HANDLING METHODS AND EPITAXIAL REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LPE S.p.A. Via Falzarego, 8 20021 Baranzate (MI) / IT | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PRETI, Silvio 20021 Baranzate (MI) / IT | 02 /
POLLI, Stefano 20021 Baranzate (MI) / IT | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al BIRD & BIRD SOCIETA TRA AVVOCATI S.R.L. Via Porlezza, 12 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | De Ros, Alberto, et al Studio Legale Bird & Bird Via Porlezza, 12 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 21729646.6 | 27.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021IB54627 | Priority number, date | IT20200012805 | 29.05.2020 Original published format: IT202000012805 | [2023/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021240418 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4158682 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/67, H01L21/677, H01L21/687, H01L21/673 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H01L21/68707 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/67742 (EP,KR);
H01L21/67103 (EP,KR);
H01L21/67109 (EP,KR);
H01L21/67343 (KR);
H01L21/67346 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | WERKZEUG ZUR HANDHABUNG VON SUBSTRATEN MIT OVERHEAD-SCHIRM UND RELEVANTE HANDHABUNGSVERFAHREN UND EPITAXIEREAKTOR | [2023/14] | English: | TOOL FOR HANDLING SUBSTRATES WITH OVERHEAD SCREEN AND RELEVANT HANDLING METHODS AND EPITAXIAL REACTOR | [2023/14] | French: | OUTIL POUR MANIPULER DES SUBSTRATS COMPRENANT UN ÉCRAN EN HAUTEUR ET PROCÉDÉS DE MANIPULATION ASSOCIÉ ET RÉACTEUR ÉPITAXIAL | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 16.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US6217663 (INOKUCHI YASUHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 14,15 * column 6, line 66 - column 7, line 60; figures 4A,4B,5A,5B,6 *[A] 1; | [XYI]US2017125272 (VAN GOGH JAMES STEPHEN [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,8,10-13 * paragraphs [0115] , [ 174] - [0182]; figures 6-10,62-65 * [Y] 14,15 [I] 6,9 |