EP4157395 - REAL TIME DRIP CHAMBER MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carefusion 303 Inc. 3750 Torrey View Court San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABAL, Daniel San Diego, California 92128 / US | 02 /
BURGESS, Brendan Poway, California 92064 / US | 03 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Ramkumar San Diego, California 92129 / US | 04 /
ZIRKLE, Michael San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Gutenbergstraße 39 45128 Essen / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21729737.3 | 12.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021US32067 | Priority number, date | US202063030817P | 27.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063030817 P | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021242526 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4157395 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/14, A61M5/142, A61M5/168 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A61M5/1411 (EP);
A61M5/1689 (US);
A61M5/142 (US);
A61M5/16831 (US);
A61M5/1684 (EP);
A61M2205/3306 (EP);
A61M2205/3317 (EP);
A61M2205/3375 (EP);
A61M2205/3379 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | ECHTZEIT-TROPFKAMMERMONITOR | [2023/14] | English: | REAL TIME DRIP CHAMBER MONITOR | [2023/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE CHAMBRE DE GOUTTE-À-GOUTTE EN TEMPS RÉEL | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 02.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2380612 (SORIN GROUP ITALIA SRL [IT]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2017189613 (HUNGERFORD ROGER L [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US2017216521 (KOLKO BETH ELISE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,12-14 * figures 1B, 3, 4, 6, 9, 10, 11, 13 * * paragraphs [0046] - [0047] - [0 49] , [0 52] - [0054] - [0 56] - [0057] - [0 59] - [0060] - [0 66] - [0069] - [0 72] - [0073] - [0075] - [0080] * * paragraphs [0090] - [0093] - [0 97] - [0100] - [ 105] - [0108] - [ 115] - [0125] * * paragraphs [0134] - [0145] - [ 148] - [0155] - [ 159] * [Y] 4-8,10,11,15-18 [I] 19,20; | [A]EP3266481 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2018200431 (NACKAERTS AXEL [NL], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [XAYI]US2020114072 (ADDIEGO NICHOLAS [US], et al) [X] 19,20 * figures 1, 2, 3, 4, 5A * * paragraphs [0020] - [0022] - [0 24] , [0 26] , [0 28] - [0029] - [0 32] - [0044] - [0 46] - [0047] * [A] 10,11,18 [Y] 4-8,15-17 [I] 1,13; | [YA] - RAHUL BHATTACHARYYA ET AL, "RFID tag antenna based sensing: Does your beverage glass need a refill?", RFID, 2010 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100414), ISBN 978-1-4244-5742-7, pages 126 - 133, XP031677632 [Y] 10,11,18 * p.126 left column section I. Introduction l.1-14, p.127 left column l.1-11, p.127 left column section III. Tag antena based sensing principle l.1 - p.127 right column l.12, p.132 section IV. Conclusion l.1 - p.133. left column l.41 * [A] 1,13 |