EP4157904 - NOVEL METHACRYLATE COPOLYMER AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENDRES, Thomas 55131 Mainz / DE | 02 /
MOERS, Christian 63225 Langen / DE | 03 /
SCHMIED, Fabian-Pascal 64285 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
SCHATTKA, Jan Hendrik 64287 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
NOLLENBERGER, Kathrin 62495 Darmstadt / DE | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21729835.5 | 26.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021EP63996 | Priority number, date | EP20200176980 | 28.05.2020 Original published format: EP 20176980 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021239787 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4157904 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08F220/60, A61K9/28, A61K47/32, A61K9/20, A61K31/216, A61K31/522 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
C08F220/60 (EP,US);
A23L33/10 (US);
A61K31/216 (EP,US);
A61K31/522 (EP,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP);
A61K9/2846 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/522, A61K2300/00 (EP);
C08F220/60, C08F220/1804, C08F220/14 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | METHACRYLATCOPOLYMER UND DIESES ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2023/14] | English: | NOVEL METHACRYLATE COPOLYMER AND COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING IT | [2023/14] | French: | NOUVEAU COPOLYMÈRE DE MÉTHACRYLATE ET COMPOSITIONS LE COMPRENANT | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 18.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0039176 (GOODRICH CO B F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8,9 * page 5, line 10 - line 16 * * example 8 * * claims 49, 54 * * page 29, line 12 - line 25 * [I] 4,6; | [AD]WO2019096833 (EVONIK ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * claims 1,15 ** page 3, line 19 - line 28 *; | [X]US2020115556 (SAKAMOTO SHOHEI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,9 * paragraphs [0014] , [0350] * * compounds C-13 * | by applicant | US4452862 | US6391338 | WO2012048740 | US8399523 | WO2019096833 | - CAIZHEN LIANG et al., Colloids and Surfaces A: Physiochem. Eng. Aspects, (20170000), vol. 513, pages 136 - 145 | - H.F. MARK et al., Encyclopaedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, J. Wiley, (19890000), vol. 10, page 1 |