Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4150888 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

EP21730058 US202016875247 US2021032323W US202418605309



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024223837Global Dossier 04.07.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202016875247 15.05.2020
US202418605309 14.03.2024
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4150888Global Dossier 22.03.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202016875247 15.05.2020
WO2021US32323 13.05.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2021231783Global Dossier 18.11.2021A1
Priority number Date
US202016875247 15.05.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US11962829Global Dossier 16.04.2024B2
US2021360310 18.11.2021A1
Priority number Date
US202016875247 15.05.2020