EP4164476 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CORRELATING PROTON RESONANCE FREQUENCY THERMOMETRY WITH TISSUE TEMPERATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic Navigation, Inc. 826 Coal Creek Circle Louisville CO 80027 / US | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAPOTE, Marco Louisville, Colorado 80027 / CO | 02 /
ESPARZA-COSS, Emilio Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | 03 /
VINCELETTE, Rebecca Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | 04 /
LEMLEY, Katherine Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | 05 /
BAXTER, Eric Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | 06 /
SANTANA, Shawn Louisville, Colorado 80027 / US | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21730371.8 | 12.05.2021 | [2023/16] | WO2021US32032 | Priority number, date | US202063038329P | 12.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063038329 P | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021252122 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4164476 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4164476 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/01, A61B5/055, A61B5/00, A61B18/22, A61B90/14, G01R33/48 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
A61B5/015 (EP,US);
A61B18/22 (EP,US);
A61B17/683 (US);
A61B5/0036 (EP,US);
A61B5/055 (EP,US);
A61B90/11 (EP);
A61B90/14 (EP);
G01K13/20 (EP);
G01K3/005 (US);
G01K7/00 (US);
G01R33/4804 (EP,US);
G01R33/4808 (US);
A61B2017/00911 (US);
A61B2018/00011 (EP);
A61B2018/00059 (US);
A61B2018/00273 (US);
A61B2018/00446 (EP);
A61B2018/00529 (EP);
A61B2018/00547 (EP);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00642 (EP);
A61B2018/0066 (EP);
A61B2018/00678 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00708 (EP);
A61B2018/00714 (US);
A61B2018/00791 (EP);
A61B2018/00803 (US);
A61B2018/00809 (EP);
A61B2018/00898 (EP,US);
A61B2018/2075 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR KORRELATION DER PROTONENRESONANZFREQUENZTHERMOMETRIE MIT GEWEBETEMPERATUREN | [2023/16] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CORRELATING PROTON RESONANCE FREQUENCY THERMOMETRY WITH TISSUE TEMPERATURES | [2023/16] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE CORRÉLATION DE THERMOMÉTRIE À FRÉQUENCE DE RÉSONANCE DE PROTONS AVEC DES TEMPÉRATURES DE TISSU | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 04.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IA]US2013102880 (GULSEN GULTEKIN [US], et al); | [A]US2015257830 (TYC RICHARD [CA], et al); |