EP4150378 - LIDAR SYSTEM WITH HIGH-RESOLUTION SCAN PATTERN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 22.08.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luminar, LLC 2603 Discovery Drive, Suite 100 Orlando, FL 32826 / US | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURBANK, Istvan Peter Orlando, FL 32826 / US | 02 /
WEED, Matthew D. Orlando, FL 32826 / US | 03 /
WOJACK, Jason Paul Orlando, FL 32826 / US | 04 /
EICHENHOLZ, Jason M. Orlando, FL 32826 / US | 05 /
TROFYMOV, Dmytro Orlando, FL 32826 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Purdylucey Intellectual Property 6-7 Harcourt Terrace D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 21730712.3 | 12.05.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021US31973 | Priority number, date | US202063023981P | 13.05.2020 Original published format: US 202063023981 P | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021231559 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4150378 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/931 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
G01S7/4817 (EP,US);
G01S17/931 (EP,US);
B60W60/001 (US);
G01S17/10 (EP,US);
G01S17/34 (EP);
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
G01S7/4814 (US);
G01S7/484 (US);
B60W2420/408 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | LIDAR-SYSTEM MIT HOCHAUFLÖSENDEM ABTASTMUSTER | [2023/12] | English: | LIDAR SYSTEM WITH HIGH-RESOLUTION SCAN PATTERN | [2023/12] | French: | SYSTÈME LIDAR AVEC MOTIF DE BALAYAGE À HAUTE RÉSOLUTION | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 24.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2014014838 (2R1Y [US]) [X] 1,19-24,30 * paragraphs [0175] - [0343]; figures 10A, 15 * [I] 2-19,25-27; | [A]US2018188355 (BAO JUNWEI [US], et al) [A] 1-30* paragraph [0075]; figures 3, 6A *; | [XI]US2019107607 (DANZIGER ERIC C [US]) [X] 1-6,19-24,28-30 * paragraphs [0050] - [0173]; figures 4, 27-30 * [I] 7-18,25-27; | [X]WO2019069260 (LEDDARTECH INC [CA]) [X] 1,30 * pages 18-40; figures 7, 25 * |