EP4161563 - TREATMENT OF CD30-POSITIVE CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tessa Therapeutics Ltd. 138 Depot Road 07-01 Singapore 109683 / SG | For all designated states The University of North Carolina at Chapel Hill 109 Church Street Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MYO, Aung Singapore 109683 / SG | 02 /
HORAK, Ivan David Singapore 109683 / SG | 03 /
SERODY, Jonathan Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US | 04 /
DOTTI, Gianpietro Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US | 05 /
SAVOLDO, Barbara Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21730909.5 | 04.06.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021EP65037 | Priority number, date | US202063035104P | 05.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063035104 P | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021245249 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4161563 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K31/41 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K39/464417 (US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/7076 (EP,US);
A61K39/4611 (EP,US);
A61K39/4622 (US);
A61K39/4631 (EP,US);
A61K39/464411 (US);
A61K39/464429 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
C07K14/70521 (US);
C07K14/70578 (US);
A61K2239/31 (EP);
A61K2239/38 (EP);
A61K2239/48 (EP);
C07K2317/53 (US);
C07K2319/02 (US);
C07K2319/03 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4184, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7076, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/464429, A61K2300/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON CD30-POSITIVEM KREBS | [2023/15] | English: | TREATMENT OF CD30-POSITIVE CANCER | [2023/15] | French: | TRAITEMENT DU CANCER CD30 POSITIF | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 23.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 30.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 30.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.11.2023 | Decision despatched | 30.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 30.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2015028444 (UNIVERSITÄT ZU KÖLN [DE]) [Y] 16-26* page 4, line 5 - line 30; sequence 3 *; | [X]US2020016199 (TURTLE CAMERON J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10,12,13 * page 1, paragraphs 0004, 0006, 0010 * * page 2, paragraph 17 * * page 3, paragraph 28 * * page 12, paragraphs 0102, 0104 *; | [XY] - GROVER NATALIE S ET AL, "A Phase Ib/II Study of Anti-CD30 Chimeric Antigen Receptor T Cells for Relapsed/Refractory CD30+ Lymphomas", BIOLOGY OF BLOOD AND MARROW TRANSPLANTATION, (2019), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BBMT.2018.12.149, ISSN 1083-8791, XP085593890 [X] 1-15 * Abstract 83 * [Y] 16-26 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbmt.2018.12.149 | [XD] - RAMOS CARLOS A ET AL, "CD30-Chimeric Antigen Receptor (CAR) T Cells for Therapy of Hodgkin Lymphoma (HL)", BIOLOGY OF BLOOD AND MARROW TRANSPLANTATION, (201903), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.BBMT.2018.12.145, ISSN 1083-8791, XP085593886 [XD] 1-3,5,6,9,10,12,13 * Abstract 79 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbmt.2018.12.145 | by applicant | WO03059282 | WO2004010957 | WO2005001038 | US2005009769 | WO2006089232 | WO2007044616 | US2007166309 | WO2007084672 | US2007258987 | WO2011041093 | WO2012031744 | WO2015028444 | WO2016008973 | WO2020068764 | - RAMOS et al., J Clin Invest, (20170000), vol. 127, no. 9, pages 3462 - 3471 | - RAMOS et al., Biol Blood Marrow Transplant, (20190000), vol. 25, pages S7 - S75 | - VAN DER WEYDEN et al., Blood Cancer Journal, (20170000), vol. 7, page e603 | - MUTAPODACK, Immunol. Res., (20130000), vol. 57, no. 1-3, pages 151 - 8 | - "UniProt", Database accession no. P28908-3 | - MUTAPODACK, Immunol Res, (20130000), vol. 57, no. 1-3, pages 151 - 158 | - FALINI et al., Blood, (19950000), vol. 85, no. 1, pages 1 - 14 | - YOUNESANSELL, Semin Hematol, (20160000), vol. 53, pages 186 - 189 | - KEUDELL, British Journal of Haematology, (20190000), vol. 184, pages 105 - 112 | - KARANTANOS et al., Blood Lymphat Cancer, (20170000), vol. 7, pages 37 - 52 | - ALINARI, Blood, (20160000), vol. 127, pages 287 - 295 | - FLERLAGE et al., Blood, (20180000), vol. 132, pages 376 - 384 | - KELLY, Blood, (20150000), vol. 126, pages 2452 - 2458 | - MOSKOWITZ, ASCO Educational Book, (20190000), pages 477 - 486 | - CASTELLINO et al., Blood, (20110000), vol. 117, no. 6, pages 1806 - 1816 | - DOTTI et al., Immunol Rev, (20140000), vol. 257, no. 1 | - KAHLON et al., Cancer Res, (20040000), vol. 64, no. 24, pages 9160 - 9166 | - HOMBACH et al., J Immunol, (20010000), vol. 167, no. 1, pages 6123 - 6131 | - HOMBACH et al., Cancer Res., (19980000), vol. 58, no. 6, pages 1116 - 9 | - SAVOLDO et al., Blood, (20070000), vol. 110, no. 7, pages 2620 - 30 | - HOMBACH et al., Mol Ther, (20160000), vol. 24, pages 1423 - 1434 | - REVERDATTO et al., Curr Top Med Chem., (20150000), vol. 15, no. 12, pages 1082 - 1101 | - BOERSMA et al., J Biol Chem, (20110000), vol. 286, pages 41273 - 85 | - EMANUEL et al., Mabs, (20110000), vol. 3, pages 38 - 48 | - CARTER, Nat. Rev. Immunol, (20060000), vol. 6, pages 343 - 357 | - HOMBACH et al., Scand J Immunol, (19980000), vol. 48, no. 5, pages 497 - 501 | - SCHLAPSCHY et al., Protein Engineering, Design and Selection, (20040000), vol. 17, no. 12, pages 847 - 860 | - FORERO-TORRES et al., Br J Haematol, (20090000), vol. 146, pages 171 - 9 | - ANSELL et al., J Clin Oncol, (20070000), vol. 25, pages 2764 - 9 | - CARDARELLI et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20090000), vol. 15, no. 10, pages 3376 - 83 | - CHOTHIA et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19870000), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - RETTER et al., Nucl. Acids Res., (20050000), vol. 33, pages D671 - D674 | - KROGH et al., J Mol Biol, (20010000), vol. 305, pages 567 - 580 | - CHENFLIES, Nat Rev Immunol, (20130000), vol. 13, no. 4, pages 227 - 242 | - KOFLER et al., Mol. Ther., (20110000), vol. 19, no. 4, pages 760 - 767 | - HOMBACH et al., Gene Therapy, (20100000), vol. 17, pages 1206 - 1213 | - PETERSEN et al., Nature Methods, (20110000), vol. 8, pages 785 - 786 | - FRANKSIPPL, Bioinformatics, (20080000), vol. 24, pages 2172 - 2176 | - CHEN et al., Adv Drug Deliv Rev, (20130000), vol. 65, no. 10, pages 1357 - 1369 | - HOMBACH et al., Cancer Res, (19980000), vol. 58, no. 6, pages 1116 - 9 | - HOMBACH et al., Gene Therapy, (20000000), vol. 7, pages 1067 - 1075 | - HOMBACH et al., J Immunother, (19990000), vol. 22, no. 6, pages 473 - 80 | - HOMBACH et al., Cancer Res, (20010000), vol. 61, pages 1976 - 1982 | - KOEHLER et al., Cancer Res, (20070000), vol. 67, no. 5, pages 2265 - 2273 | - DI STASI et al., Blood, (20090000), vol. 113, no. 25, pages 6392 - 402 | - CHMIELEWSKI et al., Gene Therapy, (20110000), vol. 18, pages 62 - 72 | - GILHAMABKENPULE, Trends in Mol. Med., (20120000), vol. 18, no. 7, pages 377 - 384 | - CHMIELEWSKI et al., Gene Therapy, (20130000), vol. 20, pages 177 - 186 | - HOMBACH et al., Mol. Ther., (20160000), vol. 24, no. 8, pages 1423 - 1434 | - RAMOS et al., J. Clin. Invest., (20170000), vol. 127, no. 9, pages 3462 - 3471 | - MAUS et al., Annu Rev Immunol, (20140000), vol. 32, pages 189 - 225 | - WANGRIVIERE, Mol Ther Oncolytics, (20160000), vol. 3, page 16015 | - SOMERVILLEDUDLEY, Oncoimmunology, (20120000), vol. 1, no. 8, pages 1435 - 1437 | - SIMMONSALBEROLA-ILA, Methods Mol Biol, (20160000), vol. 1323, pages 99 - 108 | - KOH et al., Molecular Therapy - Nucleic Acids, (20130000), vol. 2, page e114 | - FULCHERWONG, Immunol Cell Biol, (19990000), vol. 77, no. 6, pages 559 - 564 | - BUCK et al., Biotechniques, (20080600), vol. 44, no. 7, pages 927 - 9 | - SALIMITCHISON, PNAS USA, (20080219), vol. 105, no. 7, pages 2415 - 2420 | - ZARITSKAYA et al., Expert Rev Vaccines, (20110000), vol. 9, no. 6, pages 601 - 616 | - KLEBANOFF et al., Trends Immunol, (20050000), vol. 26, no. 2, pages 111 - 7 | - MURANSKI et al., Nat Clin Pract Oncol, (20060000), no. 12, pages 668 - 81 | - CHESON et al., J Clin Oncol, (20140000), vol. 32, pages 3059 - 3068 | - SODING, J, Bioinformatics, (20050000), vol. 21, pages 951 - 960 | - NOTREDAME et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20000000), vol. 302, no. 2000, pages 205 - 217 | - LASSMANNSONNHAMMER, BMC Bioinformatics, (20050000), vol. 6, no. 298 | - KATOHSTANDLEY, Molecular Biology and Evolution, (20130000), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 772 - 780 | - GOTTESMAN, Pathology and Laboratory Medicine International, (20160000), vol. 8, pages 27 - 36 | - HOELLER et al., Histopathology, (20100000), vol. 56, pages 217 - 228 | US20040630351 |