EP4165015 - AMINO ACID-BASED POLYMERIZABLE COMPOUNDS AND OPHTHALMIC DEVICES PREPARED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson and Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway, Suite 100 Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHADEVAN, Shivkumar Jacksonville Florida 32256 / US | 02 /
SINHA, Dola Jacksonville Florida 32256 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Yong Jacksonville Florida 32256 / US | 04 /
MAHARVI, Ghulam Jacksonville Florida 32256 / US | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2023/16] | Application number, filing date | 21731298.2 | 24.05.2021 | [2023/16] | WO2021IB54497 | Priority number, date | US202063039493P | 16.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063039493 P | US202117317287 | 11.05.2021 Original published format: US202117317287 | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021255552 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4165015 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4165015 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07C237/22, C07C279/14, C07C309/18, C07C323/58, C07C323/59, C07D233/64, G02C7/04 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
C07C279/14 (EP,CN,KR);
A61F2/16 (KR);
C07C233/49 (CN);
C07C237/22 (EP,CN,KR);
C07C309/15 (CN);
C07C309/18 (EP,KR);
C07C323/58 (EP,CN,KR);
C07C323/59 (EP,CN);
C07D209/20 (CN);
C07D233/64 (EP,CN,KR);
C07F7/0838 (CN);
C07F7/1804 (CN);
C08F230/08 (KR);
C08F283/12 (CN);
G02B1/043 (KR);
G02C7/049 (EP,CN)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F283/12, C08F220/54, C08F220/20 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2023/16] | C07C237/22, C07C279/14, C07C309/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMINOSÄUREBASIERTE POLYMERISIERBARE VERBINDUNGEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE OPHTHALMISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2023/16] | English: | AMINO ACID-BASED POLYMERIZABLE COMPOUNDS AND OPHTHALMIC DEVICES PREPARED THEREFROM | [2023/16] | French: | COMPOSÉS POLYMÉRISABLES À BASE D'ACIDES AMINÉS ET DISPOSITIFS OPHTALMIQUES PRÉPARÉS À PARTIR DE CEUX-CI | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2021 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 03.11.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5369142 (CULBERTSON BILLY M [US], et al); | [X]WO2006010083 (REDDY G RAMACHANDRA [US], et al); | [X]US2008234391 (MCCORMICK CHARLES L [US], et al); | [X]EP1982716 (NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]); | [X]WO2010056778 (SIGNUM BIOSCIENCES INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2011070402 (SAY RIDVAN [TR]); | [X]EP2345635 (NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP]); | [X]WO2012097876 (UNIV PADOVA [IT], et al); | [I]WO2013096604 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US]); | [XI]WO2013142058 (MOMENTIVE PERFORMANCE MAT INC [US]); | [I]WO2018009311 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US]); | by applicant | US3408429 | US3660545 | US3808178 | US4113224 | US4120570 | US4136250 | US4153641 | US4197266 | EP0080539 | US4436887 | US4495313 | US4659782 | US4659783 | US4691820 | US4740533 | US4889664 | US4910277 | US5006622 | US5034461 | US5039459 | US5054610 | US5070215 | US5236969 | US5244981 | US5270418 | US5298533 | US5314960 | US5331067 | US5337888 | US5371147 | US5375698 | US5409104 | US5467868 | US5515964 | US5573108 | US5609246 | US5695049 | US5697495 | US5704468 | US5711416 | US5722536 | US5824719 | US5823327 | US5849811 | US5944853 | US5965631 | US5983608 | US5998498 | US6020445 | US6029808 | US6044966 | US6367929 | US6401915 | US6420453 | US6423761 | WO03022321 | US6767979 | US6822016 | WO2008061992 | US7396890 | US7461937 | US7468398 | US7538146 | US7553880 | US7572841 | US7666921 | US2010048847 | US7691916 | US7786185 | US7825170 | US7934830 | US7956131 | US8022158 | US8138290 | US8273802 | US8389597 | US8399538 | US8415404 | US8420711 | US8450387 | US8470906 | US8487058 | US8507577 | US8568626 | US8637621 | US8937110 | US8937111 | US8940812 | US8980972 | US9056878 | US9057821 | US9125808 | US9140825 | US9156934 | US9170349 | US9217813 | US9244196 | US9244197 | US9260544 | US9297928 | US9297929 | US2018037690 |