EP4356390 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ASSOCIATING DOSE RELATED DATA CAPTURED WITH AND STORED IN AN ADD-ON DEVICE TO A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | 22.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALLERDINGS, Alexander 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 02 /
HARVEY-COOK, Adam Moyo Billericay Essex CM12 OUD / GB | 03 /
PLUMPTRE, David Aubrey Spa WR9 7RQ / GB | 04 /
GAZELEY, Oliver Charles 4058 Basel / CH | 05 /
VEASEY, Robert Warwick CV34 4AB / GB | 06 /
O'HARE, Aiden Michael Warwick CV34 4AB / GB | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | McDougall, James, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 21732155.3 | 18.06.2021 | [2024/17] | WO2021EP66591 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022262992 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4356390 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G16H20/13, G16H40/60, G16H10/60, G16H20/17 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
G16H40/60 (EP,US);
G16H20/17 (EP,US);
G06K7/10366 (US);
G16H10/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ZUORDNUNG VON DOSISBEZOGENEN DATEN, DIE MIT EINER ZUSATZVORRICHTUNG ERFASST UND IN DIESER GESPEICHERT WERDEN, ZU EINER ARZNEIMITTELABGABEVORRICHTUNG | [2024/17] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR ASSOCIATING DOSE RELATED DATA CAPTURED WITH AND STORED IN AN ADD-ON DEVICE TO A DRUG DELIVERY DEVICE | [2024/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DESTINÉS À ASSOCIER DES DONNÉES RELATIVES AUX DOSES, CAPTURÉES AVEC UN DISPOSITIF COMPLÉMENTAIRE À UN DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION DE MÉDICAMENT, ET STOCKÉES DANS CELUI-CI | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 18.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2018204636 (EDWARDS ERIC S [US], et al); | [Y]US2020009322 (BAUSS MARKUS [DE], et al); | [Y]EP3660856 (TECPHARMA LICENSING AG [CH]); | [A]US10842943 (NAGAR RON [IL], et al) | by applicant | EP3151880 | WO2018104292 | US2019134305 |