EP4162133 - GUIDE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUER, Stefan 6858 Schwarzach / AT | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Wilhelm-Greil-Straße 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 21732170.2 | 31.05.2021 | [2023/15] | WO2021AT60188 | Priority number, date | AT20200050495 | 05.06.2020 Original published format: AT 504952020 | [2023/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021243388 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4162133 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4162133 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E05D15/26, E05D15/58 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
E05D15/264 (EP,US);
E05D11/0054 (AT);
E05D15/58 (EP,US);
E05D3/12 (US);
E05F1/12 (US);
E05Y2201/11 (EP);
E05Y2900/212 (EP,AT)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] | Title | German: | FÜHRUNGSSYSTEM | [2023/15] | English: | GUIDE SYSTEM | [2023/15] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GUIDAGE | [2023/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 21.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23204123.6 / EP4286634 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 25.10.2023 | DK | 25.10.2023 | EE | 25.10.2023 | HR | 25.10.2023 | LT | 25.10.2023 | LV | 25.10.2023 | NL | 25.10.2023 | PL | 25.10.2023 | RO | 25.10.2023 | RS | 25.10.2023 | SE | 25.10.2023 | SK | 25.10.2023 | SM | 25.10.2023 | BG | 25.01.2024 | NO | 25.01.2024 | GR | 26.01.2024 | IS | 25.02.2024 | PT | 26.02.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 25.10.2023 | |
DK | 25.10.2023 | ||
EE | 25.10.2023 | ||
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RO | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 25.10.2023 | |
HR | 25.10.2023 | ||
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
SM | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HR | 25.10.2023 | |
LT | 25.10.2023 | ||
LV | 25.10.2023 | ||
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
PL | 25.10.2023 | ||
RS | 25.10.2023 | ||
SE | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
NO | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
PT | 26.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 25.10.2023 | |
NL | 25.10.2023 | ||
BG | 25.01.2024 | ||
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 25.10.2023 | |
GR | 26.01.2024 | ||
IS | 25.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 25.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102014018682 (NEHL & CO KUNSTSTOFF KG [DE]); | [AP]WO2020232490 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) | by applicant | WO9923337 | EP2071108 | EP2899344 | DE102014018682 |