EP4150736 - SEGMENTED STATOR FOR A GENERATOR, COMPRISING A STRAP FOR FIXING AN END COIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy A/S Borupvej 16 7330 Brande / DK | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Simon Vyff 7160 Tørring / DK | 02 /
JENSEN, Jens Bomholt 8700 Horsens / DK | 03 /
AZAR, Ziad Sheffield South Yorkshire S10 4ED / GB | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | SGRE-Association Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG SE I IM P Intellectual Property Siemenspromenade 9 91058 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/12] | SGRE-Association Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co KG Schlierseestraße 28 81539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 21732906.9 | 17.06.2021 | [2023/12] | WO2021EP66420 | Priority number, date | EP20200190483 | 11.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20190483 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022033751 | Date: | 17.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4150736 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/14, H02K15/06, H02K3/24, H02K3/48 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
H02K1/148 (EP,US);
H02K15/063 (EP,US);
H02K3/24 (EP,US);
H02K3/28 (US);
H02K3/48 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Title | German: | SEGMENTIERTER STATOR FÜR EINEN GENERATOR MIT EINEM BAND ZUR BEFESTIGUNG EINER ENDSPULE | [2023/12] | English: | SEGMENTED STATOR FOR A GENERATOR, COMPRISING A STRAP FOR FIXING AN END COIL | [2023/12] | French: | STATOR SEGMENTÉ POUR GÉNÉRATEUR, COMPRENANT UNE SANGLE DE FIXATION D'UNE BOBINE D'EXTRÉMITÉ | [2023/12] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 14.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 17.07.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2024 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB930677 (GEN ELECTRIC) [Y] 14-18 * page 3, lines 19-36 *; | [A]EP2654179 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-20* abstract *; | [A]EP3444930 (SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY AS [DK]) [A] 1-20 * abstract *; | [XDYI]EP3637585 (SIEMENS GAMESA RENEWABLE ENERGY AS [DK]) [XD] 1,2,10,13,19,20 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * [Y] 14-18 [I] 3-9,11,12 | by applicant | EP3637585 |