EP4142894 - METHOD AND LIQUID MIXING SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING A LIQUID/FOAM MIXTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosenbauer International AG Paschinger Str. 90 4060 Leonding / AT | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLATZER, Lukas 4300 Sankt Valentin / AT | [2023/10] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 21733045.5 | 28.04.2021 | [2023/10] | WO2021AT60149 | Priority number, date | AT20200050367 | 29.04.2020 Original published format: AT 503672020 | [2023/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021217193 | Date: | 04.11.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4142894 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4142894 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A62C5/02, A62C5/00 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
A62C5/022 (EP,US);
A62C5/02 (AT);
A62C5/002 (EP,AT,US);
A62C5/008 (EP,AT,US);
B01F23/2323 (US);
B01F23/235 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND FLÜSSIGKEITS-MISCHSYSTEM ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG EINES FLÜSSIGKEITS-SCHAUMGEMISCHES | [2023/10] | English: | METHOD AND LIQUID MIXING SYSTEM FOR PROVIDING A LIQUID/FOAM MIXTURE | [2023/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE MÉLANGE DE LIQUIDE POUR FOURNIR UN MÉLANGE LIQUIDE/MOUSSE | [2023/10] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 28.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2769500 (JAMES CLIFFORD WILFRED); | [Y]EP3639898 (ROSENERGOATOM [RU], et al) | by applicant | GB967792 |