EP4158181 - CYLINDER ASSEMBLY FOR A HYDROGEN FUEL CELLS AUTOTRACTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.06.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMB Saleri S.p.A. - Societa' Benefit Via Rose di Sotto, 38/C 25126 Brescia / IT | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANTULLI, Renato 25126 Brescia / IT | 02 /
AMORES, Fatima 25126 Brescia / IT | 03 /
MONDINELLI, Francesco 25126 Brescia / IT | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Pulieri, Gianluca Antonio Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Piazza della Vittoria, 11 25122 Brescia / IT | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21733196.6 | 28.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021IB54689 | Priority number, date | IT20200012934 | 29.05.2020 Original published format: IT202000012934 | [2023/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021240456 | Date: | 02.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4158181 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F02M21/02, B60K15/03, F16K31/00, F16K17/38, F16K1/30, F17C13/12, // F17C13/08 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
F02M21/0206 (EP);
F17C13/084 (EP,US);
B60K15/03006 (EP);
F02M21/0242 (EP);
F02M21/0293 (EP);
F16K17/38 (EP,US);
F16K31/002 (EP,US);
F17C13/123 (EP,US);
H01M8/04201 (US);
B60K2015/03013 (EP);
B60K2015/03026 (EP);
B60K2015/03381 (EP);
F17C2201/0119 (EP,US);
F17C2201/056 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0142 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0146 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0332 (EP,US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/036 (EP,US);
F17C2260/018 (EP);
F17C2260/042 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0168 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (EP);
Y02T10/30 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | F02M21/02, F16K1/30, F16K17/38, F16K31/00, B60K15/03 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | ZYLINDERANORDNUNG FÜR EIN WASSERSTOFFBRENNSTOFFZELLENAUTOTRAKTIONSSYSTEM | [2023/14] | English: | CYLINDER ASSEMBLY FOR A HYDROGEN FUEL CELLS AUTOTRACTION SYSTEM | [2023/14] | French: | ENSEMBLE CYLINDRE POUR SYSTÈME D'AUTOTRACTION À PILES À COMBUSTIBLE À HYDROGÈNE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 17.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6418962 (WOZNIAK JOHN J [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 1-9 ** columns 1, 4, 5 *; | [A]WO2004014683 (EMER SRL [IT], et al) [A] 9-11 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * claims 1-10 *; | [A]US2004163731 (EICHELBERGER DONALD PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 1, 2, 4 * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0095] *; | [A]EP1925864 (MICHELIN RECH TECH [CH], et al) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0 25] - [0033] *; | [A]US2012003559 (FRENAL ANTOINE [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * figures 1-15 * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0101] *; | [I]EP2973812 (INTELLIGENT ENERGY LTD [GB]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 6-13, 18A-18F * * paragraphs [0022] , [0 44] - [0098] *; | [I]US2016064753 (IACONIS JEAN-LOUIS [CA]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * figures 1C, 2D, 8-13, 18A-18F * * paragraphs [0048] , [0 79] - [0116] - [ 125] - [0130] * |