Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4158871 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202180040314 EP21733339 KR20227042592 US2021034463W US202117303291 US202318461322 US202418818945



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2025061182Global Dossier 20.02.2025A1
Priority number Date
US202063033070 01.06.2020
US202117303291 26.05.2021
US202318461322 05.09.2023
US202063041671 19.06.2020
US202418818945 29.08.2024
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12086231Global Dossier 10.09.2024B2
US2024028689 25.01.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202063033070 01.06.2020
US202117303291 26.05.2021
US202318461322 05.09.2023
US202063041671 19.06.2020
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20230008786Global Dossier 16.01.2023A
Priority number Date
US202063033070 01.06.2020
US202117303291 26.05.2021
US202063041671 19.06.2020
WO2021US34463 27.05.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN115918033Global Dossier 04.04.2023A
Priority number Date
US202063033070 01.06.2020
US202117303291 26.05.2021
US202063041671 19.06.2020
WO2021US34463 27.05.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4158871Global Dossier 05.04.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202063033070 01.06.2020
US202117303291 26.05.2021
US202063041671 19.06.2020
WO2021US34463 27.05.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2021247356Global Dossier 09.12.2021A1
Priority number Date
US202063033070 01.06.2020
US202117303291 26.05.2021
US202063041671 19.06.2020
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US11783022Global Dossier 10.10.2023B2
US2021374226 02.12.2021A1
Priority number Date
US202063033070 01.06.2020
US202117303291 26.05.2021
US202063041671 19.06.2020