EP4175773 - STRAIGHTENING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR STRAIGHTENING A METAL STRIP OR A FLAT METAL PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kohler Maschinenbau GmbH Einsteinallee 7 77933 Lahr / DE | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜLLERLEILE, Anton 77656 Offenburg / DE | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21733735.1 | 09.06.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021EP65495 | Priority number, date | DE202010117682 | 03.07.2020 Original published format: DE102020117682 | [2023/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022002551 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4175773 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B21D1/02 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
B21D1/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | RICHTMASCHINE UND VERFAHREN ZUM RICHTEN EINES METALLBANDES ODER EINES FLÄCHIGEN METALLTEILS | [2023/19] | English: | STRAIGHTENING MACHINE AND METHOD FOR STRAIGHTENING A METAL STRIP OR A FLAT METAL PART | [2023/19] | French: | MACHINE À DRESSER ET PROCÉDÉ DE REDRESSAGE D'UNE BANDE MÉTALLIQUE OU D'UNE PIÈCE MÉTALLIQUE PLATE | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 28.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]JPS5271367 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO) [I] 1-21 * page 327 * * figures 1-3 *; | [I]DE9320671U (ARKU MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-21 * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [I]US5666836 (BONNEFONT MARC [FR], et al) [I] 1-21 * claim 4 * * figures 1-3 *; | [I]US2007163321 (BROWN TIMOTHY J [GB]) [I] 1-21 * claims 1, 13-15, 23 * * figures 1-3, 5, 12 *; | [XI]CN103071702 (JP STEEL PLANTECH CO) [X] 1-5,9,13-16,19-21 * claims 1-6 * * paragraph [0041] * * figures 1, 2, 5, 6 * [I] 6-8,10-12,17,18; | [I]CN104550326 (SHENYANG DONGBAO HAIXING METAL MATERIAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [I] 1-21 * claims 1-4 * * figures 1, 7-9 *; | [A]DE102015102271 (ARKU MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-21* claims 1-4, 9-11 *; | [I]US2020171559 (MAILLARD SÉBASTIEN [FR], et al) [I] 1-21 * claims 1-3, 7 * * paragraphs [0031] - [0040] * * figures 3, 5 * | by applicant | DE102015102271 |