31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
08.03.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] |
09.02.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
26.01.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] |
17.11.2023 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] |
10.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2023 [2023/50] |
03.11.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] |
27.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
13.10.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] |
25.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
18.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2023 [2023/38] |
11.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
04.08.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2023 [2023/36] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
21.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.08.2023 [2023/34] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
30.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] |
09.12.2022 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] |
07.12.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.12.2022 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.12.2022 |
Change: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.12.2022 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
21.08.2022 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.08.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
12.08.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.09.2022 [2022/37] |
01.07.2022 |
Change - designated states |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
14.01.2022 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
14.01.2022 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
14.01.2022 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.02.2022 [2022/07] |
12.01.2022 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.12.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.12.2021 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
19.11.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.11.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
17.11.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.07.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|