EP4168789 - INTERPRETING AN ELECTROCHEMICAL RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universiteit Antwerpen Prinsstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE WAEL, Karolien 9170 Sint-Pauwels / BE | 02 /
VAN ESPEN, Pierre 2060 Antwerpen / BE | 03 /
VAN ECHELPOEL, Robin 2000 Antwerpen / BE | 04 /
DE JONG, Mats 2440 Geel / BE | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Winger Mouterij 16 bus 101 3190 Boortmeerbeek / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/17] | DenK iP bv Mouterij 16 bus 101 3190 Boortmeerbeek / BE | Application number, filing date | 21734111.4 | 18.06.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021EP66563 | Priority number, date | EP20200181041 | 19.06.2020 Original published format: EP 20181041 | EP20200215395 | 18.12.2020 Original published format: EP 20215395 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021255230 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4168789 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/48 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
G01N27/48 (EP,US);
G01N27/3274 (US);
G01N27/3272 (US);
G01N27/3273 (US);
G01N33/15 (US);
G01N33/227 (US);
G01N33/48714 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | INTERPRETATION EINER ELEKTROCHEMISCHEN ANTWORT | [2023/17] | English: | INTERPRETING AN ELECTROCHEMICAL RESPONSE | [2023/17] | French: | INTERPRÉTATION D'UNE RÉPONSE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 19.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 19.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 18.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 18.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.10.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2019076829 (UNIV ANTWERPEN [BE]) [Y] 1-15 * page 18, lines 12-23 * * page 19, lines 1-5 * * page 24, lines 15-28 * * page 25, line 17 * * page 26, lines 2-4 * * page 47, lines 15-31 *; | [Y] - RYAN P. BORMAN ET AL, "Automated Algorithm for Detection of Transient Adenosine Release", ACS CHEMICAL NEUROSCIENCE, US, (20161208), vol. 8, no. 2, doi:10.1021/acschemneuro.6b00262, ISSN 1948-7193, pages 386 - 393, XP055719463 [Y] 1-15 * Abstract, Graphical abstract, Overview of adenosine algorithm, Background subtraction, FSCV transient * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acschemneuro.6b00262 | [AP] - VAN ECHELPOEL ROBIN ET AL, "Unlocking the full potential of voltammetric data analysis: A novel peak recognition approach for (bio)analytical applications", TALANTA, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 233, doi:10.1016/J.TALANTA.2021.122605, ISSN 0039-9140, (20210611), (20210611), XP086682302 [AP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.talanta.2021.122605 | by applicant | WO2014070801 | - BORMAN, RYAN P. et al., "Automated algorithm for detection of transient adenosine release", ACS chemical neuroscience, (20170000), vol. 8.2, doi:10.1021/acschemneuro.6b00262, pages 386 - 393, XP055719463 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acschemneuro.6b00262 | - "Spectrum evaluation", VAN ESPEN, PIET, Handbook of X-ray Spectrometry, (20020000), vol. 4, pages 239 - 339 |