EP4157168 - AN OSTOMY POUCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 06.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConvaTec Limited GDC First Avenue Deeside, Flintshire CH5 2NU / GB | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, Alice Flintshire CH5 2NU / GB | 02 /
FALLOON, Sabrina Flintshire CH5 2NU / GB | 03 /
EVANS, Kevin Flintshire CH5 2NU / GB | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21734456.3 | 01.06.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021GB51337 | Priority number, date | GB20200008256 | 02.06.2020 Original published format: GB 202008256 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021245394 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4157168 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/445, A61F5/44 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A61F5/445 (EP,US);
A61F5/4407 (EP,US);
A61F5/4404 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | OSTOMIEBEUTEL | [2023/14] | English: | AN OSTOMY POUCH | [2023/14] | French: | POCHE POUR STOMIE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 02.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2004049837 (FALCONER MALCOLM [GB], et al); | [I]US2011028923 (MURRAY KIMBERLY [US]); | [I]US2018333290 (JONES JAMES DONALD [US], et al) |