EP4172746 - VISUAL INTERFACE FOR A COMPUTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Chihua Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
UENO, Yuki Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/18] | Townsend, Martyn, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 21735024.8 | 28.05.2021 | [2023/18] | WO2021US34664 | Priority number, date | GB20200009876 | 29.06.2020 Original published format: GB 202009876 | US202017012014 | 03.09.2020 Original published format: US202017012014 | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022005658 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4172746 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481, G06F3/01, G06F3/023, G06F3/0484 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/04815 (EP,US);
G06F1/163 (EP);
G06F3/012 (EP);
G06F3/013 (EP);
G06F3/0236 (EP);
G06F3/0237 (EP);
G06F3/04812 (US);
G06F3/0482 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | VISUELLE SCHNITTSTELLE FÜR EIN RECHNERSYSTEM | [2023/18] | English: | VISUAL INTERFACE FOR A COMPUTER SYSTEM | [2023/18] | French: | INTERFACE VISUELLE POUR SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE | [2023/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 22.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012062465 (SPETALNICK JEFFREY R [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0085] ** figure 4 *; | [Y]US2018173417 (FORESTI ADALBERTO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0038] * * figures 2, 3 *; | [Y]US2018321798 (KAWAMURA DAISUKE [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0086] * * figures 2, 6-10 * * claims 2-4 *; | [A]US2019235729 (DAY JOHN AUSTIN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0184] * * paragraph [0196] - paragraph [0200] * |