EP4348187 - DETERMINING A ZERO-VERIFICATION CRITERIA FOR A ZERO VERIFICATION OF A VIBRATORY METER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Micro Motion, Inc. 7070 Winchester Circle Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUTTLER, Marc Allan Erie, Colorado 80516 / US | 02 /
PATTEN, Andrew Timothy Boulder, Colorado 80302 / US | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Ellis, Christopher Paul Ollila Law Limited Unit 7 The Courtyard Timothys Bridge Road Stratford upon Avon CV37 9NP / GB | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 21735083.4 | 02.06.2021 | [2024/15] | WO2021US35364 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022256000 | Date: | 08.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4348187 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/84, G01F25/10 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
G01F1/8436 (EP,US);
G01F25/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG EINES NULLÜBERPRÜFUNGSKRITERIUMS FÜR EINE NULLÜBERPRÜFUNG EINES VIBRATIONSMESSERS | [2024/15] | English: | DETERMINING A ZERO-VERIFICATION CRITERIA FOR A ZERO VERIFICATION OF A VIBRATORY METER | [2024/15] | French: | DÉTERMINATION D'UN CRITÈRE DE VÉRIFICATION DE ZÉRO POUR UNE VÉRIFICATION DE ZÉRO D'UN VIBROMÈTRE | [2024/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 20.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2014137626 (PATTEN ANDREW TIMOTHY [US], et al); | [A]US2019234784 (PATTEN ANDREW TIMOTHY [US]); | [A]US2020249063 (GRECO SALVATORE D [US]) |