Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023318439 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP65294 | 08.06.2021 | EP20189369 | 04.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN116114156 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP65294 | 08.06.2021 | EP20189369 | 04.08.2020 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4150750 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2021EP65294 | 08.06.2021 | EP20189369 | 04.08.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022028754 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20189369 | 04.08.2020 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3952085 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP20189369 | 04.08.2020 |