EP4165432 - USE-CASE-SPECIFIC WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS-BASED RADAR REFERENCE SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.03.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED ATTN: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Sungwoo San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
NAM, Wooseok San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
LUO, Tao San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LI, Junyi San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
MONTOJO, Juan San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 06 /
SUN, Jing San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 07 /
ZHANG, Xiaoxia San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 08 /
GAAL, Peter San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 09 /
YOO, Taesang San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 10 /
MERLIN, Simone San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2023/16] | Representative(s) | Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/16] | Loveless, Ian Mark Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | Application number, filing date | 21735459.6 | 25.05.2021 | [2023/16] | WO2021US34088 | Priority number, date | US202063038033P | 11.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063038033 P | US202117329109 | 24.05.2021 Original published format: US202117329109 | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021252180 | Date: | 16.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4165432 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/02, H04W16/14 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
G01S7/023 (EP,KR);
H04W4/38 (KR,US);
G01S7/0232 (EP,KR);
G01S7/0234 (EP,KR);
H04B7/0617 (EP,KR);
H04B7/086 (EP,KR);
H04L27/261 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0007 (EP,KR);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0014 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0023 (EP,KR);
H04L5/0048 (EP,KR);
H04W16/14 (EP,KR);
H04W72/0446 (KR,US);
H04W72/0453 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/16] | Title | German: | AUF EINSATZFALLSPEZIFISCHER DRAHTLOSER KOMMUNIKATION BASIERENDE RADARREFERENZSIGNALE | [2023/16] | English: | USE-CASE-SPECIFIC WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS-BASED RADAR REFERENCE SIGNALS | [2023/16] | French: | SIGNAUX DE RÉFÉRENCE RADAR BASÉS SUR DES COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL SPÉCIFIQUES À UN CAS D'UTILISATION | [2023/16] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/16] | 17.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2020107249 (STAUFFER ERIK RICHARD [US], et al); |