EP4189933 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR POLICY CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.02.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2023/50] |
Former [2023/23] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 16483 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Yumei 417 67 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
ZHANG, Hong 417 62 Göteborg / SE | 03 /
FERNANDEZ ALONSO, Susana 28009 Madrid / ES | 04 /
HE, Yingjiao Shanghai, 200335 / CN | 05 /
XU, Juan Shanghai, 200335 / CN | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2023/23] | Application number, filing date | 21735896.9 | 18.06.2021 | [2023/23] | WO2021EP66654 | Priority number, date | WO2020CN106156 | 31.07.2020 Original published format: PCT/CN2020/106156 | [2023/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022022889 | Date: | 03.02.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4189933 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4189933 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L41/0813, H04L41/0894, // H04L41/0895 | [2023/27] | CPC: |
H04L41/0813 (EP);
H04W76/30 (US);
H04L41/0894 (EP);
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04W80/10 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/23] | H04L41/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR RICHTLINIENSTEUERUNG | [2023/23] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES FOR POLICY CONTROL | [2023/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREILS DE COMMANDE DE POLITIQUE | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 01.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23214159.8 / EP4312413 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 13.12.2023 | |
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2009056046 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0120] ** figures 4, 5 *; | [A]WO2018174846 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1, 3, 4 *; | [A] - HUAWEI, "Session Rule error handling", vol. CT WG3, no. Reno, USA; 20190513 - 20190517, (20190602), 3GPP DRAFT; 29512_CR0245R4_(REL-16)_C3-192179 WAS 1395 SESSION RULE ERROR HANDLING(REL-16), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPH, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/CT/Docs/CP%2D191072%2Ezip, (20190602), XP051745306 [A] 1-20 * page 2, line 1 -page 4, line 9 * * figure 4.2.3.2-1 * |