EP4169360 - DEVICES FOR PROTECTING A BODY FROM DAMAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphene Composites Limited NETPark Incubator Thomas Wright Way Sedgefield, Stockton-on-Tees TS21 3FD / GB | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVINE, Stephen Hebbum Tyne and Wear NE31 1DA / GB | 02 /
CHEN, Sandy Balcombe, West Sussex RH17 6LP / GB | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 21736020.5 | 16.06.2021 | [2023/17] | WO2021GB51508 | Priority number, date | GB20200009330 | 18.06.2020 Original published format: GB 202009330 | [2023/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021255444 | Date: | 23.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4169360 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/02, B64G1/58, H05K7/20 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
B64G1/50 (EP);
F28F21/02 (GB,US);
B32B3/14 (US);
B32B5/18 (US);
B32B5/245 (GB);
B32B9/007 (GB,US);
B64G1/58 (EP,GB,US);
H05K5/0209 (EP);
H05K7/2039 (EP);
B32B2266/126 (US);
B32B2307/302 (US);
B32B2605/00 (US);
B32B3/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM SCHUTZ EINES KÖRPERS VOR BESCHÄDIGUNGEN | [2023/17] | English: | DEVICES FOR PROTECTING A BODY FROM DAMAGE | [2023/17] | French: | DISPOSITIFS POUR LA PROTECTION D'UN CORPS CONTRE DES DOMMAGES | [2023/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 16.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010194179 (WALTZ JAMES C [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0065] * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]US2014287641 (STEINER III STEPHEN A [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0062] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094] * * figures 6-7 *; | [XA]US2015198380 (HAJ-HARIRI HOSSEIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-12,15 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0066] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0168] - paragraph [0173] * * paragraph [0180] * * paragraph [0186] * * paragraph [0233] * * paragraph [0287] * * paragraph [0289] * * figures 3A-3D,8A-8C,15E,16,18C * [A] 3,4,13,14; | [XA]US2016265857 (BENTHEM BRUIN [NL]) [X] 1,2,5-12,15 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0032] * * claim 2 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 3,4,13,14; | [A]CN107792401 (AEROSPACE DONGFANGHONG DEV CO LTD SHENZHEN) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0027] * * figure 1 *; | [A]CN110626011 (GONGYI VAN RES YIHUI COMPOSITE MATERIAL CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 1-2 *; | [A]US2020061970 (CHEN SANDY WINTHROP [GB]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0073] ** figures 1-8 * | by applicant | WO2010142953 | - "Reporting Physisorption Data for Gas/Solid Systems", Pure and Applied Chemistry, (19850000), vol. 57, page 603 | - "Pyrolytic carbon", RATNER, BUDDY D., Biomaterials science: an introduction to materials in medicine, Academic Press, (20040000), pages 171 - 180 | - KAWAGUCHIKAWASHIMANAKAJIMA, "Syntheses and Structures of New Graphite-like Materials of Composition BCN(H) and BC N(H", Chem. Mater., (19960000), vol. 8, no. 6, doi:10.1021/cm950471y, pages 1197 - 1201, XP000626880 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm950471y |