EP4193399 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2023/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STENGEL, Ilona c/o Merck KGaA Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 DARMSTADT / DE | 02 /
VOGES, Frank c/o Merck KGaA Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 DARMSTADT / DE | 03 /
MUJICA-FERNAUD, Teresa c/o Merck KGaA Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 DARMSTADT / DE | 04 /
ANÉMIAN, Rémi Manouk c/o Merck KGaA Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 DARMSTADT / DE | [2023/24] | Representative(s) | Merck Patent Association Merck Patent GmbH 64271 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 21736325.8 | 30.06.2021 | [2023/24] | WO2021EP67941 | Priority number, date | EP20200189947 | 06.08.2020 Original published format: EP 20189947 | [2023/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021170886 | Date: | 02.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4193399 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H10K85/30, H10K85/60, // H10K50/155, H10K50/15 | [2024/39] | CPC: |
H10K85/633 (EP);
H10K50/156 (EP,KR);
H10K50/155 (EP,KR);
H10K50/81 (KR);
H10K50/82 (KR);
H10K85/30 (EP,KR);
H10K85/615 (EP,KR);
H10K85/631 (KR);
H10K85/6572 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/24] | H01L51/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/24] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/24] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/24] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/24] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/24] | 02.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2016062371 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al); | [A]EP3131901 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP3462516 (NOVALED GMBH [DE]) | by applicant | WO0070655 | WO0141512 | WO0202714 | WO0215645 | EP1191613 | EP1191612 | EP1191614 | WO2005019373 | WO2005033244 | US2005258742 |