EP4178944 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING 3-METHYLTHIOPROPIONALDEHYDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Operations GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2023/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERKER, Thorsten 50374 Erftstadt / DE | 02 /
EICKER, Michael 51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | 03 /
KRUDEWIG, Bruno 53117 Bonn / DE | 04 /
ZHU, Haohao 53879 Euskirchen / DE | 05 /
CHEUNG, Chiu Kee 63755 Alzenau / DE | [2023/20] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [2023/20] | Application number, filing date | 21736342.3 | 06.07.2021 | [2023/20] | WO2021EP68650 | Priority number, date | EP20200184707 | 08.07.2020 Original published format: EP 20184707 | [2023/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022008505 | Date: | 13.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4178944 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4178944 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C319/18, C07C323/22 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
C07C319/18 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C319/18, C07C323/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 3-METHYLTHIOPROPIONALDEHYD | [2023/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR PREPARING 3-METHYLTHIOPROPIONALDEHYDE | [2023/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE 3-MÉTHYLTHIOPROPIONALDÉHYDE | [2023/20] | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 29.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9700858 (NOVUS INT INC [US]) | by applicant | US4225516 | US2012165573 | US2014005437 |