EP4087927 - ARTIFICIAL ORGANELLES FOR ENZYMATIC COFACTOR REDUCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 25.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ensovi, Inc. 97 Edward Foster Road Scituate, MA 02066 / US | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINOR, Kyle, A. 1187 Ocean Avenue Sea Bright, NJ 07760 / US | 02 /
MONTEMAGNO, Carlo, D. 20 Fairway View Dr. Sutton, NJ 01590 / US | 03 /
WENDELL, David, W. 7097 Paddison Rd. Cincinnati, OH 02066 / US | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21738134.2 | 07.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021US12475 | Priority number, date | US202062959001P | 09.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062959001 P | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021142102 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087927 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/02, C07K14/195, C12N15/10, C12N11/08, C12N11/18, C12P19/36 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
C12Y106/05003 (EP,US);
C12P21/00 (US);
C07K14/00 (US);
C07K14/195 (EP,US);
C07K14/245 (US);
C07K14/415 (US);
C12N11/08 (EP);
C12N11/18 (EP,US);
C12N9/0036 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/46] | C12N15/10, C12Q1/6806, C12Q1/6883 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | KÜNSTLICHE ORGANELLEN ZUR ENZYMATISCHEN COFAKTOR-REDUKTION | [2022/46] | English: | ARTIFICIAL ORGANELLES FOR ENZYMATIC COFACTOR REDUCTION | [2022/46] | French: | ORGANITES ARTIFICIELS POUR LA RÉDUCTION ENZYMATIQUE DE COFACTEUR | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 25.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y] - WANG GUOSHU ET AL, "Light-Driven Biocatalysis in Liposomes and Polymersomes: Where Are We Now?", CATALYSTS, (20181225), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.3390/catal9010012, page 12, XP093059298 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * Section 3. (Artificial Photosynthetic Systems for Light Driven Translocation * * figure 5(a) * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/catal9010012 | [Y] - LEE KEEL YONG ET AL, "Photosynthetic artificial organelles sustain and control ATP-dependent reactions in a protocellular system", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, New York, (20180528), vol. 36, no. 6, doi:10.1038/nbt.4140, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 530 - 535, XP093110628 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * page 531, column l, paragraph 2 - column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.4140 | [Y] - FENG XIYUN ET AL, "Coassembly of Photosystem II and ATPase as Artificial Chloroplast for Light-Driven ATP Synthesis", ACS NANO, US, (20151202), vol. 10, no. 1, doi:10.1021/acsnano.5b05579, ISSN 1936-0851, pages 556 - 561, XP093110597 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * page 556, column r, paragraph 2 - page 557, column l, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsnano.5b05579 | International search | [A]WO2008152490 (UNIV BASEL, et al) [A] 1-50* entire document *; | [XA]WO2011084540 (HELIOTRONIC ENERGY SYSTEMS LLC [US], et al) [X] 49 * entire document especially Page 24, Line 19-20; Page 26, Line 26; Page 27, Line 29-31; Page 35, Line 16-17; Figure 5 * [A] 1-48 and 50; | [A]US2016281244 (SATO NAOTOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-50 * entire document especially Para [0003]; Para [0011]; Para [00012] *; | [A]US2017113193 (GRZELAKOWSKI MARIUSZ PIOTR [US]) [A] 1-50 * entire document *; | [A] - NACE Trevor, "The Photosynthesis Equation Made Easy", Forbes, (20190826), URL: https://www.forbes.com/sites/trevornace/2019/08/26/the-photosynthesis-equation-made-easy/?sh=1b885dad200e, XP055840778 [A] 49 * entire document especially Page 1, Para 1 * | [A] - REN Xiang; Ghassemi Parham; Yuan Wenqiao; Zhou Jack; Chong Parkson; Noh Moses, "CELL-FREE ARTIFICIAL PHOTOSYNTHESIS SYSTEM", 2017 19th International Conference on Solid-State Sensors, (20170618), doi:10.1109/TRANSDUCERS.2017.7994433, pages 1859 - 1862, XP033131140 [A] 1-50 * entire document especially Page 1859, Para 5; Page 1860, Para 1; Page 1861, Para 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TRANSDUCERS.2017.7994433 |