EP4088303 - UNIFORMITY CONTROL FOR RADIO FREQUENCY PLASMA PROCESSING SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Comet Technologies USA, Inc 2730 Bearing Drive San Jose, California 95131 / US | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAVAS, Stephen E. COMET TECHNOLOGIES USA, INC. 2730 Bering Drive San Jose, California 95131 / US | 02 /
DE CHAMBRIER, Alexandre COMET TECHNOLOGIES USA, INC. 2730 Bering Drive San Jose, California 95131 / US | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Impact Intellectual Property LLP 1 Sans Walk London EC1R 0LT / GB | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21738489.0 | 09.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021US12849 | Priority number, date | US202062959630P | 10.01.2020 Original published format: US 202062959630 P | US202117145190 | 08.01.2021 Original published format: US202117145190 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021142380 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4088303 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 15.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32, H01L21/67 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
H01J37/32146 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/32935 (EP,KR);
H01J37/32183 (EP,KR,US);
H01J37/20 (US);
H01J37/244 (US);
H01J37/32082 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | GLEICHMÄSSIGKEITSSTEUERUNG FÜR FUNKFREQUENZ-PLASMAVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEME | [2022/46] | English: | UNIFORMITY CONTROL FOR RADIO FREQUENCY PLASMA PROCESSING SYSTEMS | [2022/46] | French: | CONTRÔLE D'UNIFORMITÉ POUR SYSTÈMES DE TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA RADIOFRÉQUENCE | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 15.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2003121609 (OHMI TADAHIRO [JP], et al); | [A]US2009061542 (PATRICK ROGER [US]); | [IA]US2013240482 (NAM SANG KI [US], et al); | [XA]US2017213703 (SAKANE RYOTA [JP]) | International search | [Y]US2003121609 (OHMI TADAHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2005034811 (MAHONEY LEONARD J [US], et al); | [Y]US2008197854 (VALCORE JOHN [US], et al); | [A]US2010159120 (DZENGELESKI JOSEPH P [US], et al); | [A]KR20180038596 (SEMES CO LTD [KR]) | by applicant | US2003121609 | US2013240482 | US2017213703 |