EP4087923 - CELL POPULATIONS WITH RATIONALLY DESIGNED EDITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inscripta, Inc. 5500 Central Avenue, Suite 220 Boulder CO 80301 / US | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIR, Aamir 5500 Central Ave, Suite 220 Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 02 /
ZIMMERMAN, Erik 5500 Central Ave, Suite 220 Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 03 /
FELDMAN, Emily 5500 Central Ave, Suite 220 Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 04 /
MIJTS, Benjamin 5500 Central Ave, Suite 220 Boulder, CO 80301 / US | 05 /
GARST, Andrew 5500 Central Ave, Suite 220 Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21738541.8 | 10.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021US12867 | Priority number, date | US202016740421 | 11.01.2020 Original published format: US202016740421 | US202016740420 | 11.01.2020 Original published format: US202016740420 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021142394 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087923 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/22, C12N15/87, C04B40/06, C12M1/00, C12M3/00 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
C12N15/90 (EP);
C12N15/102 (EP);
C12N9/22 (EP);
C40B40/06 (EP);
C12M41/48 (EP);
C12N2310/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | ZELLPOPULATIONEN MIT RATIONELL GESTALTETEN EDITOREN | [2022/46] | English: | CELL POPULATIONS WITH RATIONALLY DESIGNED EDITS | [2022/46] | French: | POPULATIONS DE CELLULES DOTÉES D'ÉDITIONS CONÇUES DE MANIÈRE RATIONNELLE | [2022/46] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2023/32: Claims 16-40 are deemed to be abandoned due to non-payment of the claims fees (Rule45(3) EPC). | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 23.02.2023 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 23.03.2023 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 21.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2011294217 (MCCONNELL-SMITH AUDREY [US], et al) [Y] 8 and 17 * para [0027]-[0028], Abstract *; | [Y]US2016264981 (YANG YINONG [US], et al) [Y] 9 and 18* para [0051], [0152], [0205], [0253], Abstract *; | [Y]US2018230461 (GILL RYAN T [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * para [0176], [0252] *; | [Y]US2019270987 (MASQUELIER DON [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * para [0005]. [0007], [0014], [0018], [0021]-[0022], [0067], [0077], [0145], [0315], Claim 1, Claim 11 * |