EP4087606 - SELF-ASSEMBLING, SELF-ADJUVANTING SYSTEM FOR DELIVERY OF VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The University of Queensland St Lucia, Queensland 4072 / AU | [2022/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOTH, Istvan c/o The University of Queensland St Lucia, Queensland 4072 / AU | 02 /
SKWARCZYNSKI, Mariusz c/o The University of Queensland St Lucia, Queensland 4072 / AU | 03 /
ZHAO, Guangzu c/o The University of Queensland St Lucia, Queensland 4072 / AU | [2022/46] | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2022/46] | Application number, filing date | 21738711.7 | 08.01.2021 | [2022/46] | WO2021AU50012 | Priority number, date | AU20200900058 | 09.01.2020 Original published format: AU 2020900058 | [2022/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021138721 | Date: | 15.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4087606 | Date: | 16.11.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 15.07.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/385, A61K39/215, A61K39/12, A61K39/09, C07K14/025, C07K14/165, C07K14/315, A61P31/14, A61P31/04, A61P31/20, A61P35/00 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
A61P31/04 (EP,AU);
A61K39/385 (AU);
A61K39/215 (AU,US);
A61K39/0003 (EP);
A61K39/092 (EP,AU);
A61K39/12 (EP,AU);
A61P31/14 (EP,AU,US);
A61P31/20 (EP,AU);
A61P35/00 (EP,AU);
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K14/025 (EP,AU);
C07K14/165 (EP,AU);
C07K14/315 (AU);
A61K2039/54 (EP);
A61K2039/55516 (EP);
A61K2039/55544 (EP);
A61K2039/55555 (AU,US);
A61K2039/575 (EP);
A61K2039/60 (AU);
A61K2039/6031 (US);
A61K2039/605 (EP);
A61K2039/62 (AU);
A61K2039/627 (US);
A61K2039/70 (EP);
C07K14/43536 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (AU);
C07K2319/40 (EP);
C07K2319/735 (EP);
C12N2710/20034 (EP);
C12N2770/20022 (EP);
C12N2770/20034 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] | Title | German: | SELBSTORGANISIERENDES, SELBSTADJUVIERENDES SYSTEM ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON IMPFSTOFFEN | [2022/46] | English: | SELF-ASSEMBLING, SELF-ADJUVANTING SYSTEM FOR DELIVERY OF VACCINES | [2022/46] | French: | SYSTÈME D'AUTO-ASSEMBLAGE, AUTO-ADJUVANT POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE VACCINS | [2022/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2022 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2018187515 (AVIDEA TECH INC [US], et al); | [XY]WO2019226828 (AVIDEA TECH INC [US], et al); | [PY]US10787501 (BABB ROBERT [US], et al); | [PY]CN111983226 (NAT UNIV SINGAPORE); |