EP4157315 - COMBINATION THERAPIES COMPRISING A HYPOMETHYLATION AGENT FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALX Oncology Inc. 323 Allerton Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PONS, Jaume South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 02 /
WAN, Hong South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | 03 /
RANDOLPH, Sophia South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 21739202.6 | 28.05.2021 | [2023/14] | WO2021US34967 | Priority number, date | US202063033074P | 01.06.2020 Original published format: US 202063033074 P | US202063106285P | 27.10.2020 Original published format: US 202063106285 P | US202063109083P | 03.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063109083 P | US202063114959P | 17.11.2020 Original published format: US 202063114959 P | US202163145925P | 04.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163145925 P | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021247430 | Date: | 09.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4157315 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/17, A61K31/706, A61K31/122, A61K31/496, A61P35/00, A61K45/00, A61K45/06, A61P35/02 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
A61K38/1703 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K38/1774 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/122 (EP,IL,US);
A61K31/352 (US);
A61K31/405 (US);
A61K31/496 (EP,IL);
A61K31/513 (US);
A61K31/635 (KR,US);
A61K31/706 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7068 (US);
A61K38/177 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K45/00 (EP,IL);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/6425 (US);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONSTHERAPIEN MIT EINEM HYPOMETHYLIERUNGSMITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2023/14] | English: | COMBINATION THERAPIES COMPRISING A HYPOMETHYLATION AGENT FOR TREATING CANCER | [2023/14] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIES COMPRENANT UN AGENT D'HYPOMÉTHYLATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 22.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO2017027422 (ALEXO THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [YD] 1-58 * the whole document *; | [YD]US2018037652 (LIU JIE [US], et al) [YD] 1-58 * the whole document *; | [XI]WO2020047326 (ALX ONCOLOGY INC [US]) [X] 1,3,9-12,15,21-42,49-55 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 33] , [0157] , [0177]; claims 1-140; sequences 49,77, 78, 83, * [I] 2,4-8,13,14,16-20,43-48,56-58; | [YP]WO2021076908 (FORTY SEVEN INC [US]) [YP] 1-58* paragraphs [0162] , [0163]; claims 1,8,12,13, *; | [Y] - Dinardo Courtney D ET AL, "Plenary Paper CLINICAL TRIALS AND OBSERVATIONS Venetoclax combined with decitabine or azacitidine in treatment-naive, elderly patients with acute myeloid leukemia", (20190103), URL: https://ashpublications.org/blood/article-pdf/133/1/7/1551592/blood868752.pdf, (20210920), XP055842699 [Y] 2-22,43-58 * the whole document * | [YD] - JEANNINE DIESCH ET AL, "A clinical-molecular update on azanucleoside-based therapy for the treatment of hematologic cancers", CLINICAL EPIGENETICS, GB, (20160621), vol. 8, no. 1, doi:10.1186/s13148-016-0237-y, ISSN 1868-7075, XP055760104 [YD] 1-58 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13148-016-0237-y | [YD] - TAKAHIRO SATO ET AL, "DNA Hypomethylating Drugs in Cancer Therapy", COLD SPRING HARBOR PERSPECTIVES IN MEDICINE, (20170203), vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.1101/cshperspect.a026948, page a026948, XP055707756 [YD] 1-58 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/cshperspect.a026948 | by applicant | WO2013109752 | WO2014094122 | US2015071905 | US2015329616 | WO2016023040 | WO2016063233 | WO2016187226 | WO2017027422 | US2017107270 | WO2017068164 | WO2017178653 | WO2017177333 | US9845345 | US2018037652 | EP3287470 | WO2018057669 | US9944911 | US2018105600 | WO2018081898 | WO2018081897 | US2018141986 | US2018155405 | WO2018107058 | WO2018149938 | WO2018176132 | US2018312587 | US2018312563 | WO2018210795 | WO2019023347 | US10259859 | - GABRILOVICH et al., Nat Rev Immunol, (20120000), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 253 - 68 | - OLDENBORG, ISRN Hematol, (20130000), page 614619 | - MILLER et al., "Quantitative high-throughput screening assays for the discovery and development of SIRPa-CD47 interaction inhibitors", PLoS ONE, (20190000), vol. 14, no. 7, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0218897, page e0218897, XP055654017 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0218897 | - HUSAIN et al., Biodrugs, (20180000), vol. 32, no. 5, pages 441 - 464 | - SPIESS, Molecular Immunology, (20150000), vol. 67, no. 2, pages 95 - 106 | - ZHAO et al., PNAS USA, (20110000), vol. 108, pages 18342 - 18347 | - CHAO, Cell, (20100000), vol. 142, pages 699 - 7 13 | - KIM et al., Leukemia, (20120000), vol. 26, pages 2538 - 2545 | - CHAO et al., Blood, (20110000), vol. 118, pages 4890 - 4891 | - GOTO et al., Eur J. Cancer, (20140000), vol. 50, pages 1836 - 1846 | - EDRIS et al., PNAS USA, (20120000), vol. 109, pages 6656 - 61 | - RING et al., PNAS USA, (20170000), vol. 114, no. 49, pages E10578 - E10585 | - MURATA et al., Cancer Sci, (20180000), vol. 109, no. 5, pages 1300 - 1308 | - YANIGATA et al., JCI Insight, (20170000), vol. 2, page e89140 | - PETROVA et al., Clin Cancer Res, (20170000), vol. 23, pages 1086 - 1079 | - ZHANG, XCHEN, WFAN. J et al., Disrupting CD47-SIRPa axis alone or combined with autophagy depletion for the therapy of glioblastoma Carcinogenesis, (20180000), vol. 39, pages 689 - 99 | - GREENBERG et al., "Revised international prognostic scoring system for myelodysplastic syndromes", Blood, (20120000), vol. 120, no. 12, pages 2454 - 2465 | - SCHANZ et al., "New comprehensive cytogenetic scoring system for primary myelodysplastic syndromes (MDS) and oligoblastic acute myeloid leukemia after MDS derived from an international database merge", J Clin Oncol., (20120000), vol. 30, no. 8, pages 820 - 829 | - DIESCH et al., "A clinical-molecular update on azanucleoside-based therapy for the treatment of hematologic cancers", Clin Epigenet, (20160000), vol. 8, doi:10.1186/s13148-016-0237-y, page 71, XP055760104 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s13148-016-0237-y | - SATO et al., "DNA Hypomethylating Drugs in Cancer Therapy", Cold Spring Harbor Perspectives in Medicine, (20170000), vol. 7, no. 5, doi:10.1101/cshperspect.a026948, page a026948, XP055707756 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/cshperspect.a026948 | - DATTA et al., "Novel Insights into the Molecular Mechanism of Action of DNA Hypomethylating Agents: Role of Protein Kinase C δ in Decitabine-Induced Degradation of DNA Methvltransferase 1", Genes & cancer, (20120000), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 71 - 81 | - CAS, no. 1448584-12-0 | - SATO et al., "DNA Hypomethvlating Drugs in Cancer Therapy", Cold Spring Harbor perspectives in medicine, (20170000), vol. 7, no. 5, page a026948 | - DUCHMANN et al., "Clinical update on hypomethylating agents", Int J Hematol, (20190000), vol. 1, no. 10, pages 161 - 169 | - TSE, Cancer Res., (20080000), vol. 68, no. 9, pages 3421 - 3429 | - CASARA, Oncotarget, (20080000), vol. 9, no. 28, pages 29975 - 20088 | - WEISKOPF, Eur J Cancer, (20170000), vol. 76, pages 100 - 109 | - KAUDER et al., PLoS ONE, (20180000), vol. 13, no. 8, page e0201832 | - DINARDO et al., Blood, (20190000), vol. 133, no. 1, pages 7 - 17 | - CHESON, Blood, (20000000), vol. 96, page 3671 3674 | - CHESON, Blood, (20060000), vol. 108, pages 419 - 425 | WO2019US48921 |