EP4176147 - ELECTRONIC PADLOCK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.06.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.01.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.07.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Abloy Oy Wahlforssinkatu 20 80100 Joensuu / FI | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAATIKAINEN, Juha 80710 Kontiolahti / FI | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 21739409.7 | 16.06.2021 | [2023/19] | WO2021FI50452 | Priority number, date | FI20200005701 | 01.07.2020 Original published format: FI 20205701 | [2023/19] | Filing language | FI | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022003236 | Date: | 06.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4176147 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E05B67/22, E05B47/00, E05B15/00, E05B17/00 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
E05B67/22 (EP,FI,IL,US);
E05B67/00 (FI);
E05B47/0012 (EP,IL,US);
E05B15/004 (EP,IL);
E05B15/04 (US);
E05B17/0058 (EP,IL);
E05B47/0001 (FI);
E05B47/0002 (US);
E05B49/00 (FI);
E05B67/24 (FI);
E05B2015/0406 (EP,IL,US);
E05B2015/0437 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHES VORHÄNGESCHLOSS | [2023/19] | English: | ELECTRONIC PADLOCK | [2023/19] | French: | CADENAS ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 11.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO2015049680 (KNOCK N LOCK LTD [IL]); | [I]CN107524357 (ZHUHAI YOYON ELECTRONICS TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN110107165 (NINGBO SHENGJIU CABINETS LOCK CO LTD); | [I]CN110439377 (ZHUHAI UNITECH POWER TECH CO) |